EP2712606 - Razor blade preservation system and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.07.2016 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABJP, LLP 9370 Grand Estates Way Boca Raton, FL 33496 / US | [2014/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PISICCHIO, Joseph 9370 Grand Estates Way Boca Raton, FL Florida 33496 / US | [2014/14] | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/45] | Zacco Sweden AB Valhallavägen 117 P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2014/14] | Melin Granberg, Linda Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 13182418.7 | 30.08.2013 | [2014/14] | Priority number, date | US201261695680P | 31.08.2012 Original published format: US 201261695680 P | [2014/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2712606 | Date: | 02.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2712606 | Date: | 30.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/31, A61Q9/02, A61K8/92, A61K8/97, A45D27/00, B05D5/00, B26B21/40 | [2014/30] | CPC: |
A61K8/31 (EP,US);
C09K15/08 (US);
A45D27/225 (EP,US);
A61K8/922 (EP,US);
A61K8/9789 (EP,US);
A61K8/9794 (EP,US);
A61Q9/02 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/14] | A61K8/31, A61Q9/02, A61K8/92, A61K8/97, A45D27/00, B05D5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Rasierklingenschutzsystem und -verfahren | [2014/14] | English: | Razor blade preservation system and method | [2014/14] | French: | Système et procédé de conservation de lame de rasoir | [2014/14] | Examination procedure | 14.10.2013 | Examination requested [2014/14] | 22.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/32] | 01.04.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/32] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2015 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US6039937 (NEUBAUER EDWIN P [US]) [YD] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]US6145657 (COX JERRY [US]) [Y] 1-15 * line 49 - column 4, line 9 * * abstract *; | [X]DE102007014027 (ULRICH-STURMAT FELICITAS [DE]) [X] 1,2,7 * the whole document *; | [YD]US7559330 (CHRISTENSEN SR RONALD LEE [US]) [YD] 1-15 * claim 20 *; | [YD]US2011225833 (HOFFMAN JEFFREY A [US]) [YD] 1-15* paragraph [0026] *; | [X] - "Vaseline Soap Bars", GNPD, MINTEL, (200703), Database accession no. 669906, XP002725814 [X] 1,2,4,7 * Ingredients * | [X] - "No Bother Diaper Rash", GNPD, MINTEL, (200510), Database accession no. 10235891, XP002725815 [X] 1,2,7 * Ingredients * | [X] - "Moisturizing Hand Cream", GNPD, MINTEL, (201011), Database accession no. 1436575, XP002725816 [X] 1,2,4,5 * Ingredients * | [X] - "Sport Stick SPF 15", GNPD, MINTEL, (200104), Database accession no. 10083460, XP002725817 [X] 1,2,7 * Ingredients * | by applicant | GB555655 | US3808920 | US5251752 | US5934459 | US5958394 | US6006760 | US6039937 | US6257247 | US2004235692 | US7559330 | US2009188816 | US7858027 | US2011138638 | US2011225833 |