EP2702939 - Patient mobility assessment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hill-Rom Services, Inc. 1069 State Route 46 East Batesville, IN 47006-9167 / US | [2014/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Williamson, Rachel L. 375 Woodside Court Batesville, Indiana 47006 / US | 02 /
Zerhusen, Robert Mark 10186 Owl Creek Road Cincinnati, Ohio 45252 / US | 03 /
Lachenbruch, Charles A. 110 Squires Lane Lakeway, Texas 78734 / US | 04 /
Receveur, Timothy Joseph 4646 Heritage Trail Guilford, Indiana 47022 / US | 05 /
Batta, Nicholas C. 368 E.G.S. Blvd. Batesville, Indiana 47006 / US | 06 /
Wu, Yaoning 5500 Wabach Ave. Terre Haute, Indiana 47803 / US | [2023/31] |
Former [2014/10] | 01 /
Williamson, Rachel L. 375 Woodside Court Batesville, IN Indiana 47006 / US | ||
02 /
Zerhusen, Robert Mark 10186 Owl Creek Road Cincinnati, OH Ohio 45252 / US | |||
03 /
Lachenbruch, Charles A. 110 Squires Lane Lakeway, TX Texas 78734 / US | |||
04 /
Receveur, Timothy Joseph 4646 Heritage Trail Guilford, IN Indiana 47022 / US | |||
05 /
Batta, Nicholas C. 368 E.G.S. Blvd. Batesville, IN Indiana 47006 / US | |||
06 /
Wu, Yaoning 5500 Wabach Ave. Terre Haute, IN Indiana 47803 / US | Representative(s) | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [2023/31] |
Former [2014/10] | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 13182687.7 | 02.09.2013 | [2014/10] | Priority number, date | US201261696750P | 04.09.2012 Original published format: US 201261696750 P | US201313788665 | 07.03.2013 Original published format: US201313788665 | [2014/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2702939 | Date: | 05.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2702939 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, A61G7/057, A61B5/11 | [2014/10] | CPC: |
A61B5/6892 (EP,US);
A61B5/11 (US);
A61B5/1118 (EP,US);
A61G7/0513 (EP,US);
A61G7/0524 (EP,US);
A61B2562/0247 (EP,US);
A61B2562/043 (EP,US);
A61B5/339 (EP);
A61B5/7242 (EP,US);
A61B5/742 (EP,US);
A61G2203/12 (EP,US);
A61G2203/20 (EP,US);
A61G2203/34 (EP,US);
A61G2203/44 (EP,US);
A61G7/015 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/31] |
Former [2014/10] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Bestimmung der Patientenmobilität | [2014/10] | English: | Patient mobility assessment | [2014/10] | French: | Évaluation de la mobilité d'un patient | [2014/10] | Examination procedure | 05.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.09.2014 | Examination requested [2014/42] | 05.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.12.2017 | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.08.2023 | CZ | 02.08.2023 | DK | 02.08.2023 | EE | 02.08.2023 | ES | 02.08.2023 | FI | 02.08.2023 | HR | 02.08.2023 | IT | 02.08.2023 | LT | 02.08.2023 | LV | 02.08.2023 | MC | 02.08.2023 | NL | 02.08.2023 | PL | 02.08.2023 | RO | 02.08.2023 | RS | 02.08.2023 | SE | 02.08.2023 | SI | 02.08.2023 | SK | 02.08.2023 | SM | 02.08.2023 | IE | 02.09.2023 | LU | 02.09.2023 | BE | 30.09.2023 | CH | 30.09.2023 | NO | 02.11.2023 | GR | 03.11.2023 | IS | 02.12.2023 | PT | 04.12.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
CZ | 02.08.2023 | ||
DK | 02.08.2023 | ||
EE | 02.08.2023 | ||
ES | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
IT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
MC | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SK | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
IE | 02.09.2023 | ||
LU | 02.09.2023 | ||
CH | 30.09.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
CZ | 02.08.2023 | ||
DK | 02.08.2023 | ||
EE | 02.08.2023 | ||
ES | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
IT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
MC | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SK | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
IE | 02.09.2023 | ||
LU | 02.09.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
CZ | 02.08.2023 | ||
DK | 02.08.2023 | ||
EE | 02.08.2023 | ||
ES | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
IT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
MC | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SK | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
LU | 02.09.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
CZ | 02.08.2023 | ||
DK | 02.08.2023 | ||
EE | 02.08.2023 | ||
ES | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
IT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SK | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
LU | 02.09.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
CZ | 02.08.2023 | ||
DK | 02.08.2023 | ||
EE | 02.08.2023 | ||
ES | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SK | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
LU | 02.09.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
CZ | 02.08.2023 | ||
DK | 02.08.2023 | ||
EE | 02.08.2023 | ||
ES | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SK | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
CZ | 02.08.2023 | ||
DK | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 02.08.2023 | |
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2006075559 (SKINNER ANDREW F [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * figures 1-4B,10,11 * * paragraphs [0025] , [0030] , [0035] , [0036] , [0046] , [0054] , [0056] , [0057] , [0074] , [0077] * [I] 4-15; | [XI]WO2010039255 (HLZ INNOVATION LLC [US], et al) [X] 1,4 * figures 3-5 * * paragraphs [0083] , [0 84] , [0 86] , [0 88] * [I] 2,3,5-15; | [XI]US2011302719 (SCHWIRIAN JAY [US], et al) [X] 1 * figures 2,3 * * paragraphs [0035] , [0036] , [0039] , [0040] , [0042] , [0064] , [0069] * [I] 2-15; | [XP]EP2508128 (HILL ROM SERVICES INC [US]) [XP] 1,6,8-15* paragraphs [0097] - [0099] - [0102] , [0105] - [0115] *; | [XI] - YOUSEFI R ET AL, "A smart bed platform for monitoring & Ulcer prevention", BIOMEDICAL ENGINEERING AND INFORMATICS (BMEI), 2011 4TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, (20111015), doi:10.1109/BMEI.2011.6098589, ISBN 978-1-4244-9351-7, pages 1362 - 1366, XP032071868 [X] 1 * figure 3 * * sections II.A, II.B; page 1363 * * section II.B(2); page 1364 * * section II.D; page 1365 * [I] 2-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/BMEI.2011.6098589 |