EP2722483 - Turbo-machine for compressing a gaseous or liquid fluid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.08.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.09.2017 [2017/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Atlas Copco Energas GmbH Schlehenweg 15 50999 Köln / DE | [2014/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bosen, Stefan An St. Marien 7 51143 Köln / DE | 02 /
Sopper, Alfred Michaelweg 14 50169 Kerpen / DE | 03 /
Wittich, Hauke Maria-Hilf-Straße 1 50677 Köln / DE | 04 /
Wiebe, Frank Weidenstraßenweg 15 41542 Dormagen-Gohr / DE | [2014/17] | Representative(s) | Lorenz, Bernd Ingo Thaddeus, et al Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 10 02 54 45002 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/17] | Albrecht, Rainer Harald Andrejewski-Honke Postfach 100254 45002 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 13183350.1 | 06.09.2013 | [2014/17] | Priority number, date | DE201210110029 | 19.10.2012 Original published format: DE102012110029 | [2014/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2722483 | Date: | 23.04.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2722483 | Date: | 02.09.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/06, F01D5/34, F04D29/32, F04D29/64, // F01D5/02, F01D25/22, F04D29/057, F04D29/058, F04D29/26, F16C32/04, F16C32/06 | [2015/36] | CPC: |
F01D5/066 (EP,US);
F04D29/04 (KR);
F04D29/0513 (US);
F01D5/34 (EP,US);
F04D19/04 (KR);
F04D29/058 (EP,US);
F04D29/266 (EP,US);
F04D29/321 (EP,US);
F04D29/644 (EP,US);
F01D25/22 (EP,US);
F01D5/022 (EP,US);
F05D2240/50 (EP,US);
F05D2240/51 (EP,US);
F05D2240/53 (EP,US);
F16C32/0489 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/17] | F01D5/06, F01D5/34, // F01D5/02, F01D25/22, F04D29/057, F04D29/058, F04D29/26, F16C32/04, F16C32/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/14] |
Former [2014/17] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Turbomaschine zur Verdichtung eines gas- oder dampfförmigen Fluids | [2014/17] | English: | Turbo-machine for compressing a gaseous or liquid fluid | [2014/17] | French: | Turbomachine pour compresser un fluide gazeux ou vaporeux | [2014/17] | Examination procedure | 28.01.2016 | Observations by third parties | 29.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/14] | 24.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/37] | 04.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/37] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.11.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2005025640 (SEKIGUCHI SHINICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,8,10 * figures 1, 9 * * page 4, paragraph [0082] - page 7, paragraph [0107] * [I] 5; | [XI]US2213940 (GEORGE JENDRASSIK) [X] 1,4-7,9 * figures 1,3 * * page 1, column 2, line 17 - page 2, column 2, line 19 * [I] 5; | [X]US2458149 (VAL CRONSTEDT) [X] 1,4,9 * figure 1 * * column 1, line 41 - column 3, line 27 * | other | DE403786 |