EP2845661 - Method for bending work pieces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.02.2016 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.03.2016 [2016/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bystronic Laser AG Industriestrasse 21 3362 Niederönz / CH | [2015/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jost, Stefan Burchacker 2 4556 Aeschi / CH | [2015/11] | Representative(s) | PPR AG BGZ LI-9497 Triesenberg / LI | [N/P] |
Former [2015/11] | Patentbüro Paul Rosenich AG BGZ LI-9497 Triesenberg / LI | Application number, filing date | 13183743.7 | 10.09.2013 | [2015/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2845661 | Date: | 11.03.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B21D5/00, B21D5/02 | [2015/11] | CPC: |
B21D5/02 (EP);
B21D5/004 (EP);
B23K26/032 (EP);
B23K26/0622 (EP);
B23K26/0876 (EP);
B23K26/355 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Biegen eines Werkstückes | [2015/11] | English: | Method for bending work pieces | [2015/11] | French: | Procédé de pliage d'une pièce usinée | [2015/11] | Examination procedure | 10.09.2013 | Examination requested [2015/11] | 12.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/10] | 22.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/10] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2015 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP1258298 (AMADA CO LTD [JP]) [I] 1-13 * paragraph [0217] - paragraph [0219] *; | [A]GB2467785 (FORMTEXX LTD M [GB], et al) [A] 1-13 * page 12, line 30 - line 36 *; | [A]WO9817413 (LASER PRODUCTS INC [US]) [A] 1-13 * page 10, line 12 - line 22 * * page 19, line 7 - line 21; figures 3a,3b *; | [A]US2010275668 (RIEMEIER FRIEDRICH [DE], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0144] * |