EP2848311 - Blade for a shredding apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.10.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.11.2016 [2016/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lindner, Manuel Villacher Strasse 48 9800 Spittal/Drau / AT | [2015/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lindner, Manuel Villacher Strasse 48 9800 Spittal/Drau / AT | 02 /
Schiffer, Peter Schwarzstr. 114 9872 Millstatt / AT | [2015/12] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [2015/12] | Application number, filing date | 13183838.5 | 11.09.2013 | [2015/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2848311 | Date: | 18.03.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B02C18/18, B02C18/14 | [2015/12] | CPC: |
B02C18/145 (EP);
B02C18/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Messer für Zerkleinerungsvorrichtung | [2015/12] | English: | Blade for a shredding apparatus | [2015/12] | French: | Lame pour un dispositif de découpe | [2015/12] | Examination procedure | 25.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.04.2014 | Examination requested [2015/12] | 07.01.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/46] | 23.06.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.01.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]DE202008007222U (GRINDERMAX GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,9-12 * figures 1,7 * [Y] 2 [I] 3-8; | [XY]EP2599553 (PALLMANN KG MASCHF [DE]) [X] 1,9,11 * figures 3,4,6 * [Y] 2; | [X]DE9320443U (KNAUS DIETER [DE], et al) [X] 1,9,11 * figure 4 * |