EP2708186 - Method for setting and/or controlling the physical training of a test subject [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.03.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.04.2015 [2015/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schimpl, Bernhard Aichbergerweg 17 4040 Lichtenberg / AT | [2014/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2014/12] | Representative(s) | Jell, Friedrich Bismarckstrasse 9 4020 Linz / AT | [2014/12] | Application number, filing date | 13184213.0 | 12.09.2013 | [2014/12] | Priority number, date | AT20120050380 | 12.09.2012 Original published format: AT 503802012 | [2014/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2708186 | Date: | 19.03.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/22, // A63B24/00 | [2014/12] | CPC: |
A61B5/224 (EP);
A63B24/0062 (AT);
A63B24/0075 (AT);
A63B21/0726 (EP);
A63B2214/00 (EP);
A63B2220/40 (EP);
F04C2270/0421 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Festlegung und/oder Steuerung des körperlichen Trainings eines Probanden | [2014/12] | English: | Method for setting and/or controlling the physical training of a test subject | [2014/12] | French: | Procédé de détermination et/ou de commande de l'entraînement corporel d'un sujet | [2014/12] | Examination procedure | 20.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/15] | 28.10.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/15] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2008312560 (JAMSEN ARI [FI], et al) [I] 1-7 * paragraphs [0012] , [0 27] , [0 50] - [0052] - [0 58] * * figure 4 *; | [I]US2010137107 (JAEMSAE TIMO [FI], et al) [I] 1,2,5-7 * paragraphs [0011] , [0 25] , [0 43] , [0 47] - [0049] * * figure 4 *; | [AD]EP1928317 (OULUN SEUDUN AMMATTIKORKEAKOUL [FI]) [AD] 1-7 * figure 3 *; | [A]US6059576 (BRANN THEODORE L [US]) [A] 4 * abstract * | by applicant | US2011207581 | US2009069722 | US2012094804 | WO2007036611 |