EP2848399 - A UNIT AND A METHOD FOR CARRYING OUT A FIRST OPERATION AND A SECOND OPERATION ON A WEB [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/12] | A unit and a method for carrying out a first operation and a second operation on a web | ||
[2017/25] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.08.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.05.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tetra Laval Holdings & Finance SA 70, Avenue Général-Guisan 1009 Pully / CH | [2015/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ricco', Marco Piazzale Giotto 1 41057 IT - Spilamberto / IT | [2015/12] | Representative(s) | Tetra Pak - Patent Attorneys SE AB Tetra Pak Patent Department Ruben Rausings gata 221 86 Lund / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/12] | Tetra Pak - Patent Attorneys SE AB Tetra Pak Patent Department Ruben Rausings gata 22186 Lund / SE | Application number, filing date | 13184222.1 | 13.09.2013 | [2015/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2848399 | Date: | 18.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2848399 | Date: | 13.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B31B50/10, B31B50/84, B65H23/04, B65H23/188, // B29C45/14, B29C45/17, B65H20/02, B65H20/24 | [2017/21] | CPC: |
B65H20/24 (EP,KR,US);
B29C45/14 (RU,US);
B29C45/1769 (US);
B31B50/006 (EP,KR,US);
B31B50/10 (EP,KR,US);
B31B50/104 (EP,KR,US);
B31B50/84 (EP,KR,RU,US);
B65H20/02 (US);
B65H23/048 (EP,KR,US);
B65H23/1884 (EP,KR,US);
B29L2031/7162 (US);
B31B50/102 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B65H2511/112, B65H2220/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/12] | B31B1/10, B65H23/04, // B31B1/90 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/44] |
Former [2015/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | EINHEIT UND VERFAHREN ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG EINER ERSTEN UND EINER ZWEITEN OPERATION AUF EINER BAHN | [2017/25] | English: | A UNIT AND A METHOD FOR CARRYING OUT A FIRST OPERATION AND A SECOND OPERATION ON A WEB | [2017/25] | French: | UNITÉ ET PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE METTRE EN OEUVRE UNE PREMIÈRE PUIS UNE DEUXIÈME OPÉRATION SUR UNE BANDE | [2017/25] |
Former [2015/12] | Einheit und Verfahren zur Durchführung einer ersten und einer zweiten Operation auf einer Bahn | ||
Former [2015/12] | A unit and a method for carrying out a first operation and a second operation on a web | ||
Former [2015/12] | Unité et procédé permettant de mettre en oeuvre une première puis une deuxième opération sur une bande | Examination procedure | 29.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.09.2015 | Examination requested [2015/44] | 04.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.08.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.11.2016 | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.09.2013 | AL | 13.09.2017 | AT | 13.09.2017 | CY | 13.09.2017 | CZ | 13.09.2017 | DK | 13.09.2017 | EE | 13.09.2017 | FI | 13.09.2017 | HR | 13.09.2017 | IE | 13.09.2017 | LT | 13.09.2017 | LU | 13.09.2017 | LV | 13.09.2017 | MC | 13.09.2017 | MK | 13.09.2017 | MT | 13.09.2017 | PL | 13.09.2017 | PT | 13.09.2017 | RO | 13.09.2017 | RS | 13.09.2017 | SI | 13.09.2017 | SK | 13.09.2017 | SM | 13.09.2017 | TR | 13.09.2017 | BE | 30.09.2017 | BG | 13.12.2017 | GB | 13.12.2017 | GR | 14.12.2017 | IS | 13.01.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 13.09.2013 | |
AT | 13.09.2017 | ||
CY | 13.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
IE | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LU | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
MK | 13.09.2017 | ||
MT | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PT | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
SM | 13.09.2017 | ||
TR | 13.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
GB | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | HU | 13.09.2013 | |
AT | 13.09.2017 | ||
CY | 13.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
IE | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LU | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
MK | 13.09.2017 | ||
MT | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
SM | 13.09.2017 | ||
TR | 13.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
GB | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 13.09.2013 | |
AT | 13.09.2017 | ||
CY | 13.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
IE | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LU | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
MK | 13.09.2017 | ||
MT | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
SM | 13.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
GB | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 13.09.2013 | |
AT | 13.09.2017 | ||
CY | 13.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
IE | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LU | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
MT | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
SM | 13.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
GB | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 13.09.2013 | |
AT | 13.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
IE | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LU | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
MT | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
SM | 13.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
GB | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 13.09.2017 | |
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
IE | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LU | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
MT | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
SM | 13.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
GB | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 13.09.2017 | |
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
IE | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LU | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
MT | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
SM | 13.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
GB | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 13.09.2017 | |
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
IE | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LU | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
MT | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
SM | 13.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 13.09.2017 | |
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
IE | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LU | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
SM | 13.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/33] | AT | 13.09.2017 | |
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
IE | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LU | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
SM | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 13.09.2017 | |
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
SM | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 13.09.2017 | |
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | FI | 13.09.2017 | |
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | FI | 13.09.2017 | |
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 13.09.2017 | |
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 13.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6386851 (GUSTAFSSON PER [SE]) [A] 1-15 * column 2, line 58 - column 4, line 7; figure 1 *; | [A]JP2004106431 (OTSUKA PHARMA FACTORY INC, et al) [A] 1-15* abstract * | Examination | US2002088202 | by applicant | EP2357138 |