EP2728958 - Method, apparatus and system for operating machine-to-machine devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.02.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Industrial Technology Research Institute No. 195 - Sec. 4 Chung Hsing Road Chutung Hsinchu 31040 / TW | [2023/28] |
Former [2014/19] | For all designated states Industrial Technology Research Institute No. 195 - Sec. 4 Chung Hsing Road Chutung Hsinchu 31040 / TW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Singh, Shubhranshu 14F.-4, No. 3, Ln, 175 Wuling Rd. Hsinchu City 300 / TW | [2023/28] |
Former [2014/19] | 01 /
Singh, Shubhranshu 14F.-4, No. 3, Ln, 175 Wuling Rd. 300 Hsinchu City / TW | Representative(s) | Becker Kurig & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Bavariastraße 7 80336 München / DE | [2023/28] |
Former [2014/19] | Becker Kurig Straus Patentanwälte Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13184738.6 | 17.09.2013 | [2014/19] | Priority number, date | US201261721786P | 02.11.2012 Original published format: US 201261721786 P | US201313973919 | 22.08.2013 Original published format: US201313973919 | [2014/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2728958 | Date: | 07.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2728958 | Date: | 01.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2728958 | Date: | 12.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/0446, H04L43/08, H04W52/02, // H04W4/70, H04L67/62, H04W52/38 | [2023/14] | CPC: |
H04W72/0446 (EP,US);
H04L43/08 (EP,US);
H04L67/62 (EP,US);
H04W52/0216 (EP,US);
H04W4/70 (EP,US);
H04W52/383 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/09] | H04W72/04, H04W4/00 | ||
Former IPC [2014/19] | H04W72/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/41] |
Former [2014/19] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren, Vorrichtung und System zum Betrieb von Maschine-zu-Maschine-Vorrichtungen | [2014/19] | English: | Method, apparatus and system for operating machine-to-machine devices | [2014/19] | French: | Procédé, appareil et système pour l'exploitation de dispositifs machine-machine | [2014/19] | Examination procedure | 17.09.2013 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.08.2017 | Examination requested [2017/41] | 20.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.02.2018 | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 05.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.07.2023 | CZ | 12.07.2023 | DK | 12.07.2023 | EE | 12.07.2023 | ES | 12.07.2023 | FI | 12.07.2023 | HR | 12.07.2023 | IT | 12.07.2023 | LT | 12.07.2023 | LV | 12.07.2023 | MC | 12.07.2023 | NL | 12.07.2023 | PL | 12.07.2023 | RO | 12.07.2023 | RS | 12.07.2023 | SE | 12.07.2023 | SI | 12.07.2023 | SK | 12.07.2023 | SM | 12.07.2023 | IE | 17.09.2023 | LU | 17.09.2023 | BE | 30.09.2023 | CH | 30.09.2023 | FR | 30.09.2023 | GB | 12.10.2023 | NO | 12.10.2023 | GR | 13.10.2023 | IS | 12.11.2023 | PT | 13.11.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
EE | 12.07.2023 | ||
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
IT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
MC | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
IE | 17.09.2023 | ||
LU | 17.09.2023 | ||
CH | 30.09.2023 | ||
FR | 30.09.2023 | ||
GB | 12.10.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
EE | 12.07.2023 | ||
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
IT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
MC | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
IE | 17.09.2023 | ||
LU | 17.09.2023 | ||
GB | 12.10.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
EE | 12.07.2023 | ||
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
IT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
MC | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
LU | 17.09.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
EE | 12.07.2023 | ||
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
IT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
LU | 17.09.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
EE | 12.07.2023 | ||
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
LU | 17.09.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
EE | 12.07.2023 | ||
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 12.07.2023 | |
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/05] | NL | 12.07.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2011162039 (SONY CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-31* the whole document *; | [YA]EP2416604 (HTC CORP [TW]) [Y] 5,6,11,12,17 * paragraphs [0013] , [0 36] , [0 12] , [0 24] , [0 25] * [A] 1-4,7-10,13-16,18-31; | [XYI]US2012231828 (WANG LEI [US], et al) [X] 25-27,31 * paragraphs [0030] , [0 62] - [0065] - [0 74] , [0 76] - [0079] - [0 80] , [0 81] , [0 83] , [0 85] , [0 89] * [Y] 5,6,11,12,17 [I] 1-4,7-10,13-16,18-24,28-30 | Examination | EP2587866 | - 3GPP, "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; Study on Enhancements for MTC; (Release 11)", 3GPP DRAFT; S1-120348 FS_MTCE TR 22.888, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20120220), vol. SA WG1, no. Kyoto, Japan; 20120213 - 20120217, XP050574945 |