EP2679586 - Nitrogen-containing six-membered aromatic ring derivatives and pharmaceutical products containing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.12.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daiichi Sankyo Company, Limited 3-5-1, Nihonbashi Honcho Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [2014/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takemoto, Naohiro c/o Biomedical Research Laboratories Asubio Pharma Co., Ltd. 1-1, Wakayamadai 1-chome Shimamoto-cho, Mishima-gun, Osaka 618-8513 / JP | 02 /
Murata, Kenji c/o Biomedical Research Laboratories Asubio Pharma Co., Ltd. 1-1, Wakayamadai 1-chome Shimamoto-cho, Mishima-gun, Osaka 618-8513 / JP | 03 /
Murayama, Norihito c/o Asubio Pharma Co., Ltd. 9-11, Akasaka 2-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 107-8541 / JP | 04 /
Yamada, Chikaomi c/o Biomedical Research Laboratories Asubio Pharma Co., Ltd. 1-1, Wakayamadai 1-chome Shimamoto-cho, Mishima-gun, Osaka 618-8513 / JP | [2014/01] | Representative(s) | Beckmann, Claus, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [2014/41] |
Former [2014/38] | Adam, Holger, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [2014/01] | Albrecht, Thomas Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13185144.6 | 25.04.2008 | [2014/01] | Priority number, date | JP20070118768 | 27.04.2007 Original published format: JP 2007118768 | [2014/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2679586 | Date: | 01.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2679586 | Date: | 10.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/12, A61K31/4545, A61K31/497, A61K31/501, A61K31/506, A61P9/00, A61P9/08, A61P9/10, A61P25/00, A61P43/00, C07D239/30, C07D239/36, C07D239/42, C07D239/47, C07D239/48, C07D241/20, C07D401/14, C07D405/14 | [2014/01] | CPC: |
C07D401/12 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/4545 (KR);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/08 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07D239/30 (EP,US);
C07D239/36 (EP,US);
C07D239/42 (EP,US);
C07D239/47 (EP,US);
C07D239/48 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/06] |
Former [2014/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Stickstoffhaltige, sechsgliedrige, aromatische Ringderivate und pharmazeutische Produkte damit | [2014/01] | English: | Nitrogen-containing six-membered aromatic ring derivatives and pharmaceutical products containing the same | [2014/01] | French: | Dérivés de noyau aromatique à six chaînons contenant de l'azote et produits pharmaceutiques les contenant | [2014/01] | Examination procedure | 14.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.04.2014 | Examination requested [2014/23] | 10.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 25.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.08.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08764246.8 / EP2151439 | Opposition(s) | 11.11.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.04.2008 | AT | 10.02.2016 | BE | 10.02.2016 | CY | 10.02.2016 | CZ | 10.02.2016 | DK | 10.02.2016 | EE | 10.02.2016 | FI | 10.02.2016 | HR | 10.02.2016 | LT | 10.02.2016 | LV | 10.02.2016 | MC | 10.02.2016 | NL | 10.02.2016 | PL | 10.02.2016 | RO | 10.02.2016 | SE | 10.02.2016 | SI | 10.02.2016 | SK | 10.02.2016 | TR | 10.02.2016 | IE | 25.04.2016 | LU | 25.04.2016 | CH | 30.04.2016 | LI | 30.04.2016 | MT | 30.04.2016 | BG | 10.05.2016 | NO | 10.05.2016 | GR | 11.05.2016 | IS | 10.06.2016 | PT | 13.06.2016 | [2018/32] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 25.04.2008 | |
AT | 10.02.2016 | ||
BE | 10.02.2016 | ||
CY | 10.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
MC | 10.02.2016 | ||
NL | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
SE | 10.02.2016 | ||
SI | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
TR | 10.02.2016 | ||
IE | 25.04.2016 | ||
LU | 25.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
BG | 10.05.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 25.04.2008 | |
AT | 10.02.2016 | ||
BE | 10.02.2016 | ||
CY | 10.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
MC | 10.02.2016 | ||
NL | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
SE | 10.02.2016 | ||
SI | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
IE | 25.04.2016 | ||
LU | 25.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
BG | 10.05.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
BE | 10.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
NL | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
SE | 10.02.2016 | ||
SI | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
IE | 25.04.2016 | ||
LU | 25.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
BG | 10.05.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/16] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
BE | 10.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
NL | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
SE | 10.02.2016 | ||
SI | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
LU | 25.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
BG | 10.05.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
BE | 10.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
NL | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
SE | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
LU | 25.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
BE | 10.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
NL | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
SE | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
LU | 25.04.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
BE | 10.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
NL | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
SE | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
NL | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
SE | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
NL | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
SE | 10.02.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
NL | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
SE | 10.02.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
NL | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
SE | 10.02.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
NL | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
NL | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 10.02.2016 | |
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP2002527477 (SUNTORY LIMITED) [AD] 1-4* the whole document * | by applicant | EP0184257 | WO0023076 | WO0179170 | JP2003507456 | JP2005239711 | - J. CLIN. INVEST., (2004), page 114 | - SCIENCE, (19951203), vol. 272, no. 5262, pages 664 - 666 | - A. TAGUCHI ET AL., J. CLIN. INVEST., (2004), vol. 114, no. 3, pages 330 - 338 | - M. BARINAGA, SCIENCE, (19951203), vol. 272, no. 5262, pages 664 - 666 | - Compendium for Organic Synthesis, WILEY- INTERSCIENCE: A DIVISION OF JOHN WILEY & SONS | - R. H. MACH, J. MED. CHEM., (1993), vol. 36, page 3707 | - M. P. MATTSON, BRAIN RES. REV., (1988), vol. 13, page 179 | - MARTIN G. HANSON JR., J. NEUROSCI., (19980915), vol. 18, no. 18, pages 7361 - 71 | - ICHIRO MASAKI, CIRC RES., (2002), vol. 90, pages 966 - 973 | - MASAKATSU WAKENO ET AL., CIRCULATION, (2006), vol. 114, pages 1923 - 1932 | - ICHIRO DATE ET AL., JOURNAL OF NEUROSCIENCE RESEARCH, (2004), vol. 78, pages 442 - 453 | - KRAFT ET AL., EUR. J. NEUROSCI., (200506), vol. 21, no. 11, pages 3117 - 32 | - VENKATA RAMESH DASARI ET AL., J NEUROTRAUMA., (200702), vol. 24, no. 2, pages 391 - 410 | - BASSO DM; BEATTIE MS; BRESNAHAN JC, J NEUROTRAUMA, (1995), vol. 12, pages 1 - 21 |