EP2719997 - Optical head and nozzle head with an optical head [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/16] | Optical head and nozzle head with an optical head and method for operating the same | ||
[2015/16] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2016 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SmartRay GmbH Bgm.-Finsterwalder-Ring 12 82515 Wolfratshausen / DE | [2014/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ritzl, Hans Am Kirchberg 1 82451 Münsing / DE | 02 /
Simon, Alexander Mürnsee 41 83670 Bad Heilbrunn / DE | 03 /
Barthel, Jan Stuttgarter Straße 91 71638 Ludwigsburg / DE | 04 /
Baum, Manuela Robert-Schumann-Straße 16 71083 Herrenberg / DE | 05 /
Diehl, Thomas Lenaustraße 18 70771 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE | 06 /
Meier, Stefan Schauinslandstraße 5 71263 Weil der Stadt / DE | 07 /
Richter, Mathias Hintere Wiesen 17 72108 Rottenburg / DE | 08 /
Schmidgall, Stefan Drei Eichen 2 74248 Ellhofen / DE | 09 /
Thill, Markus Mahdentalstraße 3 71065 Sindelfingen / DE | 10 /
Waletzki, Alexander Inselweg 3/2 75392 Deckenpfronn / DE | [2015/38] |
Former [2014/16] | 01 /
Ritzl, Hans Am Kirchberg 1 82451 Münsing / DE | ||
02 /
Simon, Alexander Mürnsee 41 83670 Bad Heilbrunn / DE | |||
03 /
Barthel, Jan Stuttgarter Straße 91 71638 Ludwigsburg / DE | |||
04 /
Baum, Manuela Robert-Schumann-Straße 16 71083 Herrenberg / DE | |||
05 /
Diehl, Thomas Lenaustraße 18 70771n Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE | |||
06 /
Meier, Stefan Schauinslandstraße 5 71263 Weil der Stadt / DE | |||
07 /
Richter, Mathias Hintere Wiesen 17 72108 Rottenburg / DE | |||
08 /
Schmidgall, Stefan Drei Eichen 2 74248 Ellhofen / DE | |||
09 /
Thill, Markus Mahdentalstraße 3 71065 Sindelfingen / DE | |||
10 /
Waletzki, Alexander Inselweg 3/2 75392 Deckenpfronn / DE | Representative(s) | Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/38] | Weickmann & Weickmann Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | ||
Former [2014/16] | Alber, Norbert Hansmann & Vogeser Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Albert-Roßhaupter-Straße 65 81369 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13185549.6 | 23.09.2013 | [2014/16] | Priority number, date | DE201210108902 | 21.09.2012 Original published format: DE102012108902 | [2014/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2719997 | Date: | 16.04.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2719997 | Date: | 20.08.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2719997 | Date: | 16.09.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/24, B05C11/00, B23K9/12, C09J5/00 | [2014/16] | CPC: |
G01B11/24 (EP);
B05B12/084 (EP);
B05B12/34 (EP);
B05B13/0452 (EP);
B05C11/1005 (EP);
B08B17/04 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/38] |
Former [2014/16] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Optischer Kopf sowie Düsenkopf mit einem optischen Kopf | [2015/16] | English: | Optical head and nozzle head with an optical head | [2015/16] | French: | Tête optique et tête d'injection dotée d'une tête optique | [2015/16] |
Former [2014/16] | Optischer Kopf sowie Düsenkopf mit einem optischen Kopf und Verfahren für deren Betrieb | ||
Former [2014/16] | Optical head and nozzle head with an optical head and method for operating the same | ||
Former [2014/16] | Tête optique et tête d'injection dotée d'une tête optique et leur procédé de fonctionnement | Examination procedure | 20.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/14] | 27.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.08.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.03.2015 | Opposition(s) | 17.06.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/34] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.09.2013 | AL | 16.09.2015 | BG | 16.09.2015 | CY | 16.09.2015 | CZ | 16.09.2015 | DK | 16.09.2015 | EE | 16.09.2015 | ES | 16.09.2015 | FI | 16.09.2015 | HR | 16.09.2015 | IT | 16.09.2015 | LT | 16.09.2015 | LV | 16.09.2015 | MC | 16.09.2015 | MK | 16.09.2015 | MT | 16.09.2015 | NL | 16.09.2015 | PL | 16.09.2015 | RO | 16.09.2015 | RS | 16.09.2015 | SE | 16.09.2015 | SI | 16.09.2015 | SK | 16.09.2015 | SM | 16.09.2015 | TR | 16.09.2015 | IE | 23.09.2015 | LU | 23.09.2015 | BE | 30.09.2015 | NO | 16.12.2015 | GR | 17.12.2015 | IS | 16.01.2016 | PT | 18.01.2016 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 23.09.2013 | |
BG | 16.09.2015 | ||
CY | 16.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
MK | 16.09.2015 | ||
MT | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
SM | 16.09.2015 | ||
TR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IE | 23.09.2015 | ||
LU | 23.09.2015 | ||
BE | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2018/02] | HU | 23.09.2013 | |
BG | 16.09.2015 | ||
CY | 16.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
MT | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
IE | 23.09.2015 | ||
LU | 23.09.2015 | ||
BE | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 23.09.2013 | |
BG | 16.09.2015 | ||
CY | 16.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
MT | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
IE | 23.09.2015 | ||
BE | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/22] | CZ | 16.09.2015 | |
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
MT | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
IE | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | CZ | 16.09.2015 | |
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
IE | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | CZ | 16.09.2015 | |
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
IE | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/33] | CZ | 16.09.2015 | |
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
IE | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/28] | CZ | 16.09.2015 | |
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | CZ | 16.09.2015 | |
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 16.09.2015 | |
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 16.09.2015 | |
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 16.09.2015 | |
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 16.09.2015 | |
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | FI | 16.09.2015 | |
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | FI | 16.09.2015 | |
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 16.09.2015 | |
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 16.09.2015 | |
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 16.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3800752 (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,12-16 * column 10, line 21 - column 10, line 52; figure 5B * * column 12, line 54 - column 13, line 20; figures 12-14 * * column 13, line 21 - column 13, line 43; figure 15 *; | [X]US4724302 (PENNEY CARL M [US], et al) [X] 1-5,12-16 * column 3, line 58 - column 4, line 40; figure 1 * * column 8, line 33 - column 8, line 49; figure 5 *; | [X]DE4014251 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1-5,12-16 * column 1, line 35 - column 1, line 43 *; | [I]EP1245923 (ELPATRONIC AG [CH]) [I] 1-5,12-16 * paragraph [0011]; figures 1,2 * |