EP2886059 - 4D PULSE CORRECTOR WITH DEFORMABLE REGISTRATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.05.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.06.2016 [2016/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CureFab GmbH Landshuter Allee 12 80637 München / DE | [2016/02] |
Former [2015/26] | For all designated states CureFab Technologies GmbH Landshuter Allee 12 80637 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wittmeier, Sebastian Schulstrasse 43 80634 München / DE | 02 /
Runyan, Brent J. Amalienstrasse 99 80799 München / DE | [2015/26] | Application number, filing date | 13185909.2 | 25.09.2013 | [2015/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2886059 | Date: | 24.06.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/08, G06T7/00, G06T7/20 | [2015/26] | CPC: |
A61B8/5276 (EP);
A61B8/0883 (EP);
G06T7/33 (EP);
G06T2207/10132 (EP);
G06T2207/30004 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | 4D-PULSKORREKTUR MIT DEFORMIERBARER REGISTRIERUNG | [2015/26] | English: | 4D PULSE CORRECTOR WITH DEFORMABLE REGISTRATION | [2015/26] | French: | CORRECTION D'IMPULSIONS 4D AVEC ENREGISTREMENT DÉFORMABLE | [2015/26] | Examination procedure | 25.09.2013 | Examination requested [2015/26] | 05.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/26] | 05.02.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/26] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2015 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 28.01.2014 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2015/26] | 02.02.2015 | Resumption of proceedings | [2015/26] | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2005033123 (GARDNER EDWARD A [US] ET AL) [X] 1-4,6,7,9-11,14,15 * paragraphs [0013] , [0 16] , [0 20] - [0033] - [0 36] - [0045]; figure - * [I] 5,8,12,13; | [XYI]DE102005017492 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-4,14,15 * the whole document * [Y] 6-11 [I] 5,12,13; | [XI]DE102004057026 (GE MED SYS GLOBAL TECH CO LLC [US]) [X] 1-5,14,15 * paragraphs [0007] , [0 18] , [0 27] - [0033]; figure - * [I] 6-8,12; | [XI]EP1990009 (HITACHI MEDICAL CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3,14,15 * paragraphs [0019] , [0 23] - [0035]; figure - * [I] 6,12; | [I]US2011019878 (SOUBELET ELISABETH [FR] ET AL) [I] 1-5,12,14,15 * paragraphs [0021] , [0 24] - [0033]; figure - * | [Y] - WENJIA BAI ET AL, "Spatio-temporal image registration for respiratory motion correction in PET imaging", BIOMEDICAL IMAGING: FROM NANO TO MACRO, 2009. ISBI '09. IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20090628), ISBN 978-1-4244-3931-7, pages 426 - 429, XP031502067 [Y] 6-11 * the whole document * | [XI] - TARA YATES ET AL, "A Comparison of Phase and Speckle Tracking Registration Methods for Motion Correction during HIFU Treatment", AIP CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS, (20070101), vol. 911, doi:10.1063/1.2744280, ISSN 0094-243X, pages 242 - 248, XP055102445 [X] 1-4,14,15 * the whole document * [I] 5-8,11,12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.2744280 | [XI] - CHENG-HSIEN LIN ET AL, "A Motion Compounding Technique for Speckle Reduction in Ultrasound Images", JOURNAL OF DIGITAL IMAGING ; THE JOURNAL OF THE SOCIETY FOR COMPUTER APPLICATIONS IN RADIOLOGY, SPRINGER-VERLAG, NE, (20090107), vol. 23, no. 3, ISSN 1618-727X, pages 246 - 257, XP019809329 [X] 1-4,14,15 * the whole document * [I] 5-8,12 | by applicant | - MIKOLAJCZYK, K.; SCHMID, C., "A performance evaluation of local descriptors", PATTERN ANALYSIS AND MACHINE INTELLIGENCE, IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON, (2005), vol. 27, no. 10, pages 1615 - 1630 | - DALAL, N.; TRIGGS, B., "Histograms of oriented gradients for human detection", COMPUTER VISION AND PATTERN RECOGNITION, (2005), vol. 1, pages 886 - 893 | - LOWE, D.G., "Object recognition from local scale-invariant features", COMPUTER VISION, (1999), vol. 2, pages 1150 - 1157 | - BAY, H.; ESS, A.; TUYTELAARS, T.; VAN GOOL, L., "Speeded-Up Robust Features (SURF", COMPUTER VISION AND IMAGE UNDERSTANDING, (2008), vol. 110, no. 3, pages 346 - 359 | - WAELKENS P. ET AL., MED IMAGE COMPUT COMPUT ASSIST INTERV., (2012), vol. 15, no. 1, pages 625 - 33 | - ROBERT J. ET AL., IN PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2009 6TH IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON BIOMEDICAL IMAGING: FROM NANO TO MACRO, (20090628), pages 779 - 782 | - WACHINGER, C.; YIGITSOY, M.; NAVAB, N., "Manifold Learning for Image-Based Breathing Gating with Application to 4D Ultrasound", MICCAI 2010, (2010), pages 26 - 3 3 | - HANGHANG TONG; MINGJING LI; HONGJIANG ZHANG; CHANGSHUI ZHANG, "Blur Detection for Digital Images Using Wavelet Transform", MULTIMEDIA AND EXPO, 2004. ICME '04. 2004 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, (2004), vol. 1, pages 17 - 20 |