EP2730381 - Machine for cutting wood panels or the like [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.07.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.08.2016 [2016/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BIESSE S.p.A. Via della Meccanica, 16 Pesaro / IT | [2014/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lattanzi, Lorenzo Via Mazza, 4 61100 PESARO / IT | [2014/20] | Representative(s) | Manconi, Stefano, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2014/20] | Application number, filing date | 13186040.5 | 25.09.2013 | [2014/20] | Priority number, date | IT2012BO00519 | 25.09.2012 Original published format: IT BO20120519 | [2014/20] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2730381 | Date: | 14.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B27G21/00, B27G19/00, B27G19/02, B27M1/08, F16P3/14, F16P3/12, B27B5/065 | [2014/20] | CPC: |
B27G19/00 (EP);
B27B5/065 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Maschine zum Schneiden von Holzplatten oder dergleichen | [2014/20] | English: | Machine for cutting wood panels or the like | [2014/20] | French: | Machine à découper des panneaux de bois ou analogue | [2014/20] | Examination procedure | 05.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.11.2014 | Examination requested [2014/52] | 23.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/35] | 11.04.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/35] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.10.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO0148417 (LECTRA SYSTEMES SA [FR], et al) [I] 1-5,13 * abstract * * page 2, line 11 - line 18 * * page 13, line 18 - line 22 * * page 13, line 28 - page 14, line 17 * * page 15, line 23 - line 27 * * page 21, line 1 - line 9 * * figure - *; | [A]EP1304188 (IMPRESA 2000 DI SACCHI PARIDE [IT]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0017] , [0018] * * figure 2 *; | [A]DE102007044679 (SICK AG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0024] * * figure - * |