EP2679097 - Process to control the airflow and air-leakages between two baking chambers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/01] | Process to control the airflow and air-leakages between two baking chambers | ||
[2019/24] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.10.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.05.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | New entry: Date of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEA Food Solutions Bakel B.V. Beekakker 11 5761 EN Bakel / NL | [2019/45] |
Former [2014/01] | For all designated states CFS Bakel B.V. Beekakker 11 5761 EN Bakel / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUENEN, Hendrikus Antonius Jacobus Da Kleffen 6 5825 DA Overloon / NL | [2014/01] | Representative(s) | Wolff, Felix, et al Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Waidmarkt 11 50676 Köln / DE | [2019/46] |
Former [2014/01] | Wolff, Felix, et al Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Theodor-Heuss-Ring 23 50668 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 13186178.3 | 18.04.2008 | [2014/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2679097 | Date: | 01.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2679097 | Date: | 13.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A21B1/42, A21B1/48 | [2014/01] | CPC: |
A21B1/42 (EP,US);
A21B1/48 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/46] |
Former [2014/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Steuerung des Luftstroms zwischen zwei Backkammern | [2014/01] | English: | Process to control the airflow and air-leakages between two baking chambers | [2020/39] | French: | Processus de contrôle du débit d'air et des fuites d'air entre deux chambres de cuisson | [2020/39] |
Former [2014/01] | Process to control the airflow and air-leakages between two baking chambers | ||
Former [2014/01] | Processus de contrôle du débit d'air et des fuites d'air entre deux chambres de cuisson | Examination procedure | 30.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/32] | 30.09.2015 | Observations by third parties | 07.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.09.2017 | 07.09.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 12.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 29.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 24.09.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.09.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08007605.2 / EP2110020 | Divisional application(s) | EP17189015.5 / EP3335564 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080007605) is 09.07.2010 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.08.2020
18.08.2020
ADMISSIBLE Marel Further Processing B.V. Handelstraat 3 5831 AV Boxmeer / NL Opponent's representative Brookhuis, Hendrik Jan Arnold Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C) P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [2020/39] | 27.08.2020 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 06.01.2021 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 24.02.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.04.2022 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 04.04.2022 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 26.09.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Appeal following opposition | 16.05.2022 | Appeal received No. T1195/22 | 16.05.2022 | Payment of appeal fee | 04.08.2022 | Statement of grounds filed | 27.10.2023 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure | 15.11.2023 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.04.2008 | AT | 13.11.2019 | CY | 13.11.2019 | CZ | 13.11.2019 | DK | 13.11.2019 | EE | 13.11.2019 | FI | 13.11.2019 | HR | 13.11.2019 | LT | 13.11.2019 | LV | 13.11.2019 | MC | 13.11.2019 | MT | 13.11.2019 | RO | 13.11.2019 | SI | 13.11.2019 | TR | 13.11.2019 | BG | 13.02.2020 | NO | 13.02.2020 | GR | 14.02.2020 | IS | 13.03.2020 | PT | 13.03.2020 | IE | 18.04.2020 | LU | 18.04.2020 | BE | 30.04.2020 | CH | 30.04.2020 | LI | 30.04.2020 | [2022/27] |
Former [2022/26] | AT | 13.11.2019 | |
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
TR | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
IE | 18.04.2020 | ||
LU | 18.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 13.11.2019 | |
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
IE | 18.04.2020 | ||
LU | 18.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AT | 13.11.2019 | |
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
LU | 18.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AT | 13.11.2019 | |
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
LU | 18.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/52] | AT | 13.11.2019 | |
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AT | 13.11.2019 | |
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | CZ | 13.11.2019 | |
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | CZ | 13.11.2019 | |
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | FI | 13.11.2019 | |
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | FI | 13.11.2019 | |
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 13.11.2019 | |
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 13.11.2019 | |
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 13.02.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH302518 (SPOONER FOOD MACHINERY ENGINEE [GB]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE2416189 (RINDERLE KARL) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]US4834063 (HWANG YONG Y [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * column 10, lines 23-54; figures 42-44 *; | [A]US5512312 (FORNEY ROBERT B [US], et al) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]WO2007028989 (FYLDE THERMAL ENGINEERING LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document * | Examination | WO8505546 | EP0312335 | EP0558151 | US5515775 | EP0943275 | US2005092312 | US2006040029 | WO2008008305 | by applicant | EP0558151 | EP1221575 | other | GB621799 | WO8505546 | EP0312335 | US4920998 | EP0558151 | US5515775 | EP0943275 | US2005092312 | US2006040029 | WO2008008305 | Opposition | WO9111660 | EP0558151 | WO2008008305 | EP2110020 | EP2679097 |