EP2713008 - Aerofoil for axial-flow machine with a cambered trailing edge [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.06.2017 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.06.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.07.2017 [2017/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rolls-Royce plc 62 Buckingham Gate London SW1E 6AT / GB | [2015/31] |
Former [2014/14] | For all designated states Rolls-Royce plc 65 Buckingham Gate London SW1E 6AT / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Auchoybur, Kiran 6 Persian Close, Wilmorton Derby, Derbyshire DE24 1AS / GB | [2014/14] | Representative(s) | Rolls-Royce plc Moor Lane (ML-9) PO Box 31 Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/14] | Gee, Philip David, et al Rolls-Royce plc Intellectual Property SinB-38, PO Box 31 Derby Derbyshire DE24 8BJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 13186326.8 | 27.09.2013 | [2014/14] | Priority number, date | GB20120017482 | 01.10.2012 Original published format: GB 201217482 | [2014/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2713008 | Date: | 02.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/14, F01D9/04 | [2014/14] | CPC: |
F01D5/145 (EP,US);
F01D5/142 (US);
F01D5/141 (US);
F01D9/02 (US);
F01D9/041 (EP,US);
F04D29/324 (EP);
F04D29/544 (EP);
F05D2240/122 (EP,US);
F05D2240/304 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Schaufel für Axialflussmaschine mit einer gekrümmten Hinterkante | [2014/14] | English: | Aerofoil for axial-flow machine with a cambered trailing edge | [2014/14] | French: | Profil aérodynamique pour machine à flux axial avec un bord de fuite courbé | [2014/14] | Examination procedure | 22.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.09.2014 | Examination requested [2014/44] | 08.06.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]CH335694 (VICKERS ELECTRICAL CO LTD [GB]) [X] 1 * page 2, line 20 - line 25 * * figures 2,3 * [I] 2-15; | [XI]EP1106836 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1 * figure 2 * [I] 2-15; | [XI]GB2359341 (ALSTOM POWER NV [NL]) [X] 1 * page 11, line 10 - line 14 * * figure 4 * [I] 2-15; | [XI]JP2003227302 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND) [X] 1 * figure 1 * [I] 2-15; | [XI]EP1612372 (ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD [CH]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0025] * * figure 2 * [I] 2-15; | [XI]WO2008109036 (XCELAERO CORP [US]) [X] 1 * figure 6A *[I] 2-15; | [XI]EP2133573 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0030] * * figures 3,4 * [I] 2-15 | by applicant | US6283713 | US7354243 |