EP2712627 - RGD-(bacterio)chlorophyll conjugates for photodynamic therapy and imaging of necrotic tumors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.04.2018 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.05.2018 [2018/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YEDA RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT CO. LTD. P.O. Box 95 Rehovot 76100 / IL | [2014/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Avigdor Scherz 4 Tor Ha'aviv Street 76329 Rehovot / IL | [2014/14] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/14] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13186941.4 | 01.03.2009 | [2014/14] | Priority number, date | US20080064298P | 27.02.2008 Original published format: US 64298 P | [2014/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2712627 | Date: | 02.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2712627 | Date: | 16.04.2014 | [2014/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61K41/00, A61P35/00, A61K49/00, A61K49/08, A61K49/14, A61K51/08, A61K51/04 | [2014/16] | CPC: |
A61K51/0485 (EP,US);
A61K41/0071 (EP,US);
A61K49/0036 (EP,US);
A61K49/0056 (EP,US);
A61K49/085 (EP,US);
A61K49/14 (EP,US);
A61K51/082 (EP,US);
A61K51/088 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61K41/0057 (US);
A61K51/044 (US);
A61K51/0446 (US);
A61K51/0451 (US);
C07D257/04 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2014/14] | Title | German: | RGD-(Bacterio)chlorophyllkonjugate für die photodynamische Therapie und Abbildung von nekrotischem Tumoren | [2014/14] | English: | RGD-(bacterio)chlorophyll conjugates for photodynamic therapy and imaging of necrotic tumors | [2014/14] | French: | Conjugués de RGD-(bactério)chlorophylle utilisés pour la thérapie photodynamique et imagerie de tumeurs nécrosantes | [2014/14] | Examination procedure | 08.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.10.2014 | Examination requested [2014/47] | 01.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/21] | 15.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/21] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09714191.5 / EP2257309 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20090714191) is 21.09.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]WO2008023378 (YEDA RES & DEV [IL], et al) [XP] 1-9 * claims 13-37,48,76-84,100,103 * * examples 31-39,41-43 * * compound 24 * * figures 36,37 * * page 41, lines 18-28 * * page 42, line 15 - page 43, line 10 * * page 45, lines 21-29 * * pages 69-70 * * page 73, lines 10-24 *; | [A] - BOISBRUN ET AL, "Design and photophysical properties of new RGD targeted tetraphenylchlorins and porphyrins", TETRAHEDRON, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20080206), vol. 64, no. 16, ISSN 0040-4020, pages 3494 - 3504, XP022509600 [A] 1-9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tet.2008.01.142 | [A] - FROCHOT ET AL, "Interest of RGD-containing linear or cyclic peptide targeted tetraphenylchlorin as novel photosensitizers for selective photodynamic activity", BIOORGANIC CHEMISTRY, ACADEMIC PRESS INC., NEW YORK, NY, US, (20070429), vol. 35, no. 3, ISSN 0045-2068, pages 205 - 220, XP022057138 [A] 1-9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bioorg.2006.11.005 | [A] - CONWAY C L ET AL, "In vivo and in vitro characterisation of a protoporphyrin IX-cyclic RGD peptide conjugate for use in photodynamic therapy", PHOTOCHEMICAL AND PHOTOBIOLOGICAL SCIENCES 2008 GB, (20071218), vol. 7, no. 3, pages 290 - 298, XP008107014 [A] 1-9 * published online 18.12.2007 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/b715141a | [A] - CHALEIX V ET AL, "RGD-porphyrin conjugates: Synthesis and potential application in photodynamic therapy", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, WILEY-VCH VERLAG, WEINHEIM, DE, (20030101), vol. 8, ISSN 1434-193X, pages 1486 - 1493, XP002373372 [A] 1-9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ejoc.200390208 | by applicant | DE4121876 | WO9309795 | US5650292 | US5726169 | EP0927045 | US5955585 | US6147195 | US6333319 | EP1246826 | US6569846 | US6576239 | US6740637 | WO2004045492 | WO2005120573 | US7045117 | WO2008023378 | - ALFSEN, A.; H. YU ET AL., "HIV-1-infected blood mononuclear cells form an integrin- and agrin-dependent viral synapse to induce efficient HIV-1 transcytosis across epithelial cell monolayer", MOL BIOL CELL, (2005), vol. 16, no. 9, doi:doi:10.1091/MBC.E05-03-0192, pages 4267 - 79, XP002633915 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1091/MBC.E05-03-0192 | - BECKER, A.; B. RIEFKE ET AL., "Macromolecular contrast agents for optical imaging of tumors: comparison of indotricarbocyanine-labeled human serum albumin and transferrin", PHOTOCHEM PHOTOBIOL, (2000), vol. 72, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1562/0031-8655(2000)072<0234:MCAFOI>2.0.CO;2, pages 234 - 41, XP008023884 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1562/0031-8655(2000)072<0234:MCAFOI>2.0.CO;2 | - BERTON, G.; C. A. LOWELL, "Integrin signalling in neutrophils and macrophages", CELL SIGNAL, (1999), vol. 11, no. 9, pages 621 - 35 | - BOEHM-VISWANATHAN T., "Is angiogenesis inhibition the Holy Grail of cancer therapy?", CURR OPIN ONCOL., (2000), vol. 12, no. 1, pages 89 - 94 | - BRANDIS, A.; O. MAZOR ET AL., "Novel water-soluble bacteriochlorophyll derivatives for vascular-targeted photodynamic therapy: synthesis, solubility, phototoxicity and the effect of serum proteins", PHOTOCHEM PHOTOBIOL, (2005), vol. 81, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1562/2004-12-01-RA-389, pages 983 - 93, XP055038294 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1562/2004-12-01-RA-389 | - BRITTON MM, "Nuclear magnetic resonance studies of convection in the 1.4-cyclohexanedione-bromate-acid reaction", J PHYS CHEM A, (2006), vol. 110, no. 15, pages 5075 - 80 | - BROWN, J. M.; A. J. GIACCIA, "The unique physiology of solid tumors: opportunities (and problems) for cancer therapy", CANCER RES, (1998), vol. 58, no. 7, pages 1408 - 16 | - BROWN, J. M.; W. R. WILSON, "Exploiting tumour hypoxia in cancer treatment", NAT REV CANCER, (2004), vol. 4, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1038/nrc1367, pages 437 - 47, XP055019077 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrc1367 | - BROWN, N. S.; R. BICKNELL, "Hypoxia and oxidative stress in breast cancer. Oxidative stress: its effects on the growth, metastatic potential and response to therapy of breast cancer", BREAST CANCER RES, (2001), vol. 3, no. 5, pages 323 - 7 | - BURSTEIN HJ; POLYAK K; WONG JS; LESTER SC; KAELIN CM, "Ductal carcinoma in situ of the breast", N ENGL J MED, (2004), vol. 350, no. 14, pages 1430 - 41 | - BUSSOLATI, G.; M. BONGIOVANNI ET AL., "Assessment of necrosis and hypoxia in ductal carcinoma in situ of the breast: basis for a new classification", VIRCHOWS ARCH, (2000), vol. 437, no. 4, pages 360 - 4 | - CAO, Y., "Tumor angiogenesis and therapy", BIOMED PHARMACOTHER, (2005), vol. 59, no. 2, pages 340 - 3 | - CELLINI C; HUSTON TL; MARTINS D; CHRISTOS P; CARSON J; KEMPER S; SIMMONS RM, "Multiple re-excisions versus mastectomy in patients with persistent residual disease following breast conservation surgery", AM J SURG., (2005), vol. 189, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1016/j.amjsurg.2005.03.005, pages 662 - 6, XP004898866 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.amjsurg.2005.03.005 | - CUTULI, B.; C. COHEN-SOLAL-LE NIR ET AL., "Breast-conserving therapy for ductal carcinoma in situ of the breast: the French Cancer Centers' experience", INT J RADIAT ONCOL BIOL PHYS, (2002), vol. 53, no. 4, pages 868 - 79 | - DEAN, M.; T. FOJO ET AL., "Tumour stem cells and drug resistance", NAT REV CANCER, (2005), vol. 5, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1038/nrc1590, pages 275 - 84, XP002378836 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrc1590 | - DEWHIRST, M. W., "Concepts of oxygen transport at the microcirculatory level", SEMIN RADIAT ONCOL, (1998), vol. 8, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1016/S1053-4296(98)80040-4, pages 143 - 50, XP005454781 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1053-4296(98)80040-4 | - DOUGHERTY, T. J.; C. J. GOMER ET AL., "Photodynamic therapy", J NATL CANCER INST, (1998), vol. 90, no. 12, pages 889 - 905 | - EDWARDS, J. G.; D. E. SWINSON ET AL., "Tumor necrosis correlates with angiogenesis and is a predictor of poor prognosis in malignant mesothelioma", CHEST, (2003), vol. 124, no. 5, pages 1916 - 23 | - FOLKMAN J., "Endogenous inhibitors of angiogenesis", HARVEY LECT., (1996), vol. 92, pages 65 - 82 | - FOLKMAN J., "Angiogenesis and angiogenesis inhibition: an overview", EXS, (1997), vol. 79, pages 1 - 8 | - FOLKMAN J., "A novel anti-vascular therapy for cancer", CANCER BIOL THER, (2004), vol. 3, no. 3, pages 338 - 9 | - GAZDAR AF; KURVARI V; VIRMANI A; GOLLAHON L; SAKAGUCHI M; WESTERFIELD M; KODAGODA D; STASNY V; CUNNINGHAM HT; WISTUBA II, "Characterization of paired tumor and non-tumor cell lines established from patients with breast cancer", INT J CANCER, (1998), vol. 78, no. 6, pages 766 - 74 | - GROSS S.; BRANDIS A. ET AL., "Protein-A-mediated targeting of bacteriochlorophyll-IgG to Staphylococcus aureus: a model for enhanced site- specific photocytotoxicity", PHOTOCHEM PHOTOBIOL, (1997), vol. 66, no. 6, pages 872 - 8, XP007911288 | - GROSS S.; GILEAD A.; BRANDIS A.; SCHREIBER S.; MACHLUF Y.; NEEMAN M.; SCHERZ A.; SALOMON Y., "Selective vascular and tumor responses of photodynamic therapy (PDT) with Pd bacteriopheophorbide (TOOKAD%: online and offline analyses", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 94TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH (AACR), TORONTO, (20030405), vol. 44, page 27 | - GROSS S; GILEAD A; SCHERZ A; NEEMAN M; SALOMON Y, "Monitoring photodynamic therapy of solid tumors online by BOLD-contrast MRI", NAT MED, vol. 9, no. 10, doi:doi:10.1038/nm940, pages 1327 - 31, XP002515155 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nm940 | - GUIDI AJ; FISCHER L; HARRIS JR; SCHNITT SJ, "Microvessel density and distribution in ductal carcinoma in situ of the breast", J NATL CANCER INST., (1994), vol. 86, no. 8, pages 614 - 9 | - GUIDI AJ; SCHNITT SJ; FISCHER L; TOGNAZZI K; HARRIS JR; DVORAK HF; BROWN LF, "Vascular permeability factor (vascular endothelial growth factor) expression and angiogenesis in patients with ductal carcinoma in situ of the breast", CANCER, (1997), vol. 80, no. 10, pages 1945 - 53 | - GUINEBRETIERE JM; LE MONIQUE G; GAVOILLE A; BAHI J; CONTESSO G, "Angiogenesis and risk of breast cancer in women with fibrocystic disease", J NATL CANCER INST, (1994), vol. 86, no. 8, pages 635 - 6 | - HE, X.; P. E. BRENCHLEY ET AL., "Hypoxia increases heparanase- dependent tumor cell invasion, which can be inhibited by antiheparanase antibodies", CANCER RES, (2004), vol. 64, no. 11, pages 3928 - 33 | - HENDEY, B.; M. LAWSON ET AL., "Intracellular calcium and calcineurin regulate neutrophil motility on vitronectin through a receptor identified by antibodies to integrins alphav and beta3", BLOOD, (1996), vol. 87, no. 5, pages 2038 - 48 | - HOFMANN, B.; A. BOGDANOV, JR. ET AL., "Mechanism of gadophrin-2 accumulation in tumor necrosis", J MAGN RESON IMAGING, (1999), vol. 9, no. 2, pages 336 - 41 | - HOLLAND R; HENDRIKS JH; VEBEEK AL; MRAVUNAC M; SCHUURMANS STEKHOVEN JH, "Extent, distribution, and mammographic/histological correlations of breast ductal carcinoma in situ", LANCET, (1990), vol. 335, no. 8688, pages 519 - 22 | - IYER, A. K.; G. KHALED ET AL., "Exploiting the enhanced permeability and retention effect for tumor targeting", DRUG DISCOV TODAY, (2006), vol. 11, no. 17-18, doi:doi:10.1016/j.drudis.2006.07.005, pages 812 - 8, XP025027163 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.drudis.2006.07.005 | - KAMEL, I. R.; D. A. BLUEMKE ET AL., "Role of diffusion-weighted imaging in estimating tumor necrosis after chemoembolization of hepatocellular carcinoma", AJR AM J ROENTGENOL, (2003), vol. 181, no. 3, pages 708 - 10 | - KATO, T.; T. KIMURA ET AL., "Clinicopathologic study of angiogenesis in Japanese patients with breast cancer", WORLD J SURG, (1997), vol. 21, no. 1, pages 49 - 56 | - KENNAN, R. P.; B. E. SCANLEY ET AL., "Physiologic basis for BOLD MR signal changes due to hypoxia/hyperoxia: separation of blood volume and magnetic susceptibility effects", MAGN RESON MED, (1997), vol. 37, no. 6, pages 953 - 6, XP002125855 | - KEPPLE J; VAN ZEE KJ; DOWLATSHAHI K; HENRY-TILLMAN RS; ISRAEL PZ; KLIMBERG VS, "Minimally invasive breast surgery", J AM COLL SURG, (2004), vol. 199, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1016/j.jamcollsurg.2004.07.032, pages 961 - 75, XP004651182 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jamcollsurg.2004.07.032 | - KIERAN MW; FOLKMAN J; HEYMACH J, "Angiogenesis inhibitors and hypoxia", NAT MED., (2003), vol. 9, no. 9, page 1104 | - KOUDINOVA, N. V.; J. H. PINTHUS ET AL., "Photodynamic therapy with Pd-Bacteriopheophorbide (TOOKAD): successful in vivo treatment of human prostatic small cell carcinoma xenografts", INT J CANCER, (2003), vol. 104, no. 6, pages 782 - 9 | - KRIPPL P; LANGSENLEHNER U; RENNER W; YAZDANI-BIUKI B; WOLF G; WASCHER TC; PAULWEBER B; HAAS J; SAMONIGG H, "A common 936 C/T gene polymorphism of vascular endothelial growth factor is associated with decreased breast cancer risk", INT J CANCER., (2003), vol. 106, no. 4, pages 468 - 71 | - LANG, P; M. F. WENDLAND ET AL., "Osteogenic sarcoma: noninvasive in vivo assessment of tumor necrosis with diffusion-weighted MR imaging", RADIOLOGY, (1998), vol. 206, no. 1, pages 227 - 35 | - LEE, A. H.; L. C. HAPPERFIELD ET AL., "Angiogenesis and inflammation in invasive carcinoma of the breast", J CLIN PATHOL, (1997), vol. 50, no. 8, pages 669 - 73 | - LEE, K.; R. A. ROTH ET AL., "Hypoxia, drug therapy and toxicity", PHARMACOL THER, (2007), vol. 113, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1016/j.pharmthera.2006.08.001, pages 229 - 46, XP005738005 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.pharmthera.2006.08.001 | - LEE, S. E.; S. K. HONG ET AL., "Prognostic significance of tumor necrosis in primary transitional cell carcinoma of upper urinary tract", JPN J CLIN ONCOL, (2007), vol. 37, no. L, pages 49 - 55 | - LEEK, R. D.; R. J. LANDERS ET AL., "Necrosis correlates with high vascular density and focal macrophage infiltration in invasive carcinoma of the breast", BR J CANCER, (1999), vol. 79, no. 5-6, pages 991 - 5 | - LEHTIO, K.; O. ESKOLA ET AL., "Imaging perfusion and hypoxia with PET to predict radiotherapy response in head-and-neck cancer", INT J RADIAT ONCOL BIOLPHYS, (2004), vol. 59, no. 4, pages 971 - 82 | - LYONS, S. K., "Advances in imaging mouse tumour models in vivo", J PATHOL, (2005), vol. 205, no. 2, pages 194 - 205 | - MAEDA, H.; J. WU ET AL., "Tumor vascular permeability and the EPR effect in macromolecular therapeutics: a review", J CONTROL RELEASE, (2000), vol. 65, no. 1-2, doi:doi:10.1016/S0168-3659(99)00248-5, pages 271 - 84, XP004190328 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0168-3659(99)00248-5 | - MAESHIMA, Y.; P. C. COLORADO ET AL., "Two RGD-independent alpha vbeta 3 integrin binding sites on tumstatin regulate distinct anti-tumor properties", J BIOL CHEM, (2000), vol. 275, no. 31, doi:doi:10.1074/jbc.C000186200, pages 23745 - 50, XP002177918 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.C000186200 | - MARUGAN, J. J.; C. MANTHEY ET AL., "Design, synthesis, and biological evaluation of novel potent and selective alphavbeta3/alphavbeta5 integrin dual inhibitors with improved bioavailability. Selection of the molecular core", J MED CHEM, (2005), vol. 48, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1021/jm049725u, pages 926 - 34, XP055015389 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm049725u | - MAZOR, O.; A. BRANDIS ET AL., "WSTI 1, a novel water-soluble bacteriochlorophyll derivative; cellular uptake, pharmacokinetics, biodistribution and vascular-targeted photodynamic activity using melanoma tumors as a model", PHOTOCHEM PHOTOBIOL, (2005), vol. 81, no. 2, pages 342 - 51 | - METZ, S.; H. E. DALDRUP-UNK ET AL., "Detection and quantification of breast tumor necrosis with MR imaging: value of the necrosis-avid contrast agent Gadophrin-3", ACAD RADIOL, (2003), vol. 10, no. 5, pages 484 - 90 | - MINCHINTON, A. 1.; I. F. TANNOCK, "Drug penetration in solid tumours", NAT REV CANCER, (2006), vol. 6, no. 8, pages 583 - 92 | - NI, Y.; G. BORMANS ET AL., "Necrosis avid contrast agents: functional similarity versus structural diversity", INVEST RADIOL, (2005), vol. 40, no. 8, pages 526 - 35 | - NYBERG, P.; M. YLIPALOSAARI ET AL., "Trypsins and their role in carcinoma growth", EXP CELL RES, (2006), vol. 312, no. 8, doi:doi:10.1016/j.yexcr.2005.12.024, pages 1219 - 28, XP024945016 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.yexcr.2005.12.024 | - PATAN S; MUNN LL; JAIN RK, "Intussusceptive microvascular growth in a human colon adenocarcinoma xenograft: a novel mechanism of tumor angiogenesis", MICROVASC RES., (1996), vol. 51, no. 2, pages 260 - 72 | - PATTERSON, A. V.; D. M. FERRY ET AL., "Mechanism of action and preclinical antitumor activity of the novel hypoxia-activated DNA cross-linking agent PR-104", CLIN CANCER RES, (2007), vol. 13, no. 13, doi:doi:10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-07-0478, pages 3922 - 32, XP002539263 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-07-0478 | - PLAKS V; KALCHENKO V; DEKEL N; NEEMAN M, "MRI analysis of angiogenesis during mouse embryo implantation", MAGN RESON MED., (2006), vol. 55, no. 5, pages 1013 - 22 | - PREISE D.; MAZOR O.; KOUDINOVA N.; LISCOVITCH M.; SCHERZ A.; SALOMON Y., "Bypass Of Tumor Drug Resistance By Antivascular Therapy", NEOPLIASIA, (2003), vol. 5, no. 6, pages 475 - 80 | - RANKIN SC, "MRI of the breast", BR J RADIOL., (2000), vol. 73, no. 872, pages 806 - 18 | - RELF M; LEJEUNE S; SCOTT PA; FOX S; SMITH K; LEEK R; MOGHADDAM A; WHITEHOUSE R; BICKNELL R; HARRIS AL, "Expression of the angiogenic factors vascular endothelial cell growth factor, acidic and basic fibroblast growth factor, tumor growth factor beta-1, platelet-derived endothelial cell growth factor, placenta growth factor, and pleiotrophin in human primary breast cancer and its relation to angiogenes", CANCER RES., (1997), vol. 57, no. 5, pages 963 - 9, XP002186837 | - ROSENBACH-BELKIN V; CHEN L; FIEDOR L; TREGUB I; PAVIOTSKY F; BRUMFELD V; SALOMON Y; SCHERZ A, "Serine conjugates of chlorophyll and bacteriochlorophyll: photocytotoxicity in vitro and tissue distribution in mice bearing melanoma tumors", PHOTOCHEM PHOTOBIOL., (1996), vol. 64, no. 1, pages 174 - 81 | - RUBINSTEIN, E.; A. BRANDIS ET AL., "Vascular-Targeted Photodynamic Therapy (VTP), Imaging (VTI) and localization of primary lesions and metastases by novel Bacteriochlorophyll (BCL)-RGD conjugates", PREPARATION | - SANDERS ME; SCHUYLER PA; DUPONT WD; PAGE DL, "The natural history of low-grade ductal carcinoma in situ of the breast in women treated by biopsy only revealed over 30 years of long-term follow-up", CANCER, (2005), vol. 103, no. 12, pages 2481 - 4 | - SCHAFFNER, P.; M. M. DARD, "Structure and function of RGD peptides involved in bone biology", CELL MOL LIFE SCI, (2003), vol. 60, no. 1, pages 119 - 32 | - SCHNEIDER BP; MILLER KD, "Angiogenesis of breast cancer", J CLIN ONCOL., (2005), vol. 23, no. 8, pages 1782 - 90 | - SCHREIBER S.; GROSS S.; BRANDIS A.; HARMELIN A.; ROSENBACH-BELKIN V.; SCHERZ A.; SALOMON Y., "Local photodynamic therapy (PDT) of rat C6 glioma xenografts with Pd-bacteriopheophorbide leads to decreased metastases and increase of animal cure compared with surgery", INT. J. CANCER, (2002), vol. 99, doi:doi:10.1002/ijc.10299, pages 279 - 285, XP055038741 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ijc.10299 | - SENGUPTA, S.; C. M. LOHSE ET AL., "Histologic coagulative tumor necrosis as a prognostic indicator of renal cell carcinoma aggressiveness", CANCER, (2005), vol. 104, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1002/cncr.21206, pages 511 - 20, XP055179395 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cncr.21206 | - SHIMIZU K; ASAI T; OKU N, "Antineovascular therapy, a novel antiangiogenic approach", EXPERT OPIN THER TARGETS, (2005), vol. 9, no. 1, pages 63 - 76 | - SHIRAKAWA, K; H. TSUDA; 2001 ET AL., "Absence of endothelial cells, central necrosis, and fibrosis are associated with aggressive inflammatory breast cancer", CANCER RES, vol. 61, no. 2, pages 445 - 51 | - STREUBEL B; CHOTT A; HUBER D; EXNER M; JTIGER U; WAGNER 0; SCHWARZINGER I, "Lymphoma-specific genetic aberrations in microvascular endothelial cells in B- cell lymphomas", N ENGL J MED., vol. 351, no. 3, pages 250 - 9 | - TAIT, L. R.; R. J. PAULEY ET AL., "Dynamic stromal-epithelial interactions during progression of MCFIODCIS.com xenografts", INT J CANCER, (2007), vol. 120, no. 10, pages 2127 - 34 | - TAKAGI, J., "Structural basis for ligand recognition by RGD (Arg-Gly- Asp)-dependent integrins", BIOCHEM SOC TRANS, (2004), vol. 32, pages 403 - 6 | - TANAKA, T.; S. SHIRAMOTO ET AL., "Tumor targeting based on the effect of enhanced permeability and retention (EPR) and the mechanism of receptor- mediated endocytosis (RME", INT J PHARM, (2004), vol. 277, no. 1-2, pages 39 - 61 | - TANNOCK, 1., "Cell kinetics and chemotherapy: a critical review", CANCER TREAT REP, (1978), vol. 62, no. 8, pages 1117 - 33 | - TANNOCK, I. F.; D. ROTIN, "Acid pH in tumors and its potential for therapeutic exploitation", CANCER RES, (1989), vol. 49, no. 16, pages 4373 - 84 | - TEMMING, K.; R. M. SCHIFFELERS ET AL., "RGD-based strategies for selective delivery of therapeutics and imaging agents to the tumour vasculature", DRUG RESIST UPDAT, (2005), vol. 8, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1016/j.drup.2005.10.002, pages 381 - 402, XP005328751 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.drup.2005.10.002 | - THORPE PE, "Vascular targeting agents as cancer therapeutics", CLIN CANCER RES., (2004), vol. 10, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-0642-03, pages 415 - 27, XP002543457 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-0642-03 | - TOMES, L.; E. EMBERLEY ET AL., "Necrosis and hypoxia in invasive breast carcinoma", BREAST CANCER RES TREAT, (2003), vol. 81, no. 1, pages 61 - 9 | - VAUPEL, P.; D. K. KELLEHER ET AL., "Oxygen status of malignant tumors: pathogenesis of hypoxia and significance for tumor therapy", SEMIN ONCOL, (2001), vol. 28, no. 2, pages 29 - 35 | - WAPNIR, I. L.; N. BARNARD ET AL., "The inverse relationship between microvessel counts and tumor volume in breast cancer", BREAST J, (2001), vol. 7, no. 3, pages 184 - 8 | - WEERSINK RA; BOGAARDS A; GERTNER M; DAVIDSON SR; ZHANG K; NETCHEV G; TRACHTENBERG J; WILSON BC, "Techniques for delivery and monitoring of TOOKAD (WST09)-mediated photodynamic therapy of the prostate: clinical experience and practicalities", J PHOTOCHEM PHOTOBIOL B., (2005), vol. 79, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1016/j.jphotobiol.2005.01.008, pages 211 - 22, XP025302106 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jphotobiol.2005.01.008 | - WEINMANN, M.; C. BELKA ET AL., "Tumour hypoxia: impact on biology, prognosis and treatment of solid malignant tumours", ONKOLOGIE, (2004), vol. 27, no. 1, pages 83 - 90 | - YANG, M.; E. BARANOV ET AL., "Whole-body optical imaging of green fluorescent protein-expressing tumors and metastases", PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2000), vol. 97, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.97.3.1206, pages 1206 - 11, XP000904536 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.97.3.1206 | - ZILBERSTEIN J.; BROMBERG A.; FRANTZ A.; ROSENBACH-BELKIN V.; KRITZMANN A.; PFEFERMANN R.; SALOMON Y.; SCHERZ A., "Light-dependent oxygen consumption in bacteriochlorophyll-serine-treated melanoma tumors: on-line determination using a tissue-inserted oxygen microsensor", PHOTOCHEM PHOTOBIOL., (1997), vol. 65, no. 6, pages 1012 - 1019 | - ZILBERSTEIN J.; SCHREIBER S.; BLOEMERS M. C. W. M.; BENDEL P.; NEEMAN M.; SCHECHTMAN E.; KOHEN F.; SCHERZ A.; SALOMON Y., "Antivascular treatment of solid melanoma tumors with bacteriochlorophyll-serine-based photodynamic therapy", PHOTOCHEM. PHOTOBIOL., (2001), vol. 73, doi:doi:10.1562/0031-8655(2001)073<0257:ATOSMT>2.0.CO;2, pages 257 - 266, XP002515153 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1562/0031-8655(2001)073<0257:ATOSMT>2.0.CO;2 |