EP2717245 - Colour afterglowing article [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.01.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.12.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.12.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.08.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Systemtextgruppen AB Box 8079 200 41 Malmö / SE | [2014/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jansson, Christer Almlundsvägen 4 245 92 Staffanstorp / SE | 02 /
Larsson, Daniel Tornerstigen 12 244 41 Kävlinge / SE | [2014/15] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/09] | AWA Sweden AB P.O. Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | ||
Former [2014/15] | Jakobsson, Jeanette Helene, et al Awapatent AB P.O. Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 13187205.3 | 03.10.2013 | [2014/15] | Priority number, date | SE20120051124 | 05.10.2012 Original published format: SE 1251124 | [2014/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2717245 | Date: | 09.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2717245 | Date: | 05.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2717245 | Date: | 26.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G09F13/20 | [2014/15] | CPC: |
G09F13/20 (EP,SE);
C09D5/22 (SE)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/24] |
Former [2014/15] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Farbphosphoreszierender Artikel | [2014/15] | English: | Colour afterglowing article | [2014/15] | French: | Article à luminescence résiduelle de couleur | [2014/15] | Examination procedure | 30.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/28] | 04.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 02.12.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.07.2016 | Opposition(s) | 27.11.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.10.2013 | AL | 26.02.2020 | AT | 26.02.2020 | CY | 26.02.2020 | CZ | 26.02.2020 | EE | 26.02.2020 | HR | 26.02.2020 | LT | 26.02.2020 | LV | 26.02.2020 | MC | 26.02.2020 | MK | 26.02.2020 | MT | 26.02.2020 | PL | 26.02.2020 | RO | 26.02.2020 | RS | 26.02.2020 | SI | 26.02.2020 | SK | 26.02.2020 | SM | 26.02.2020 | TR | 26.02.2020 | BG | 26.05.2020 | GR | 27.05.2020 | IS | 26.06.2020 | IE | 03.10.2020 | LU | 03.10.2020 | CH | 31.10.2020 | LI | 31.10.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 03.10.2013 | |
AL | 26.02.2020 | ||
AT | 26.02.2020 | ||
CY | 26.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
MT | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
TR | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
IE | 03.10.2020 | ||
LU | 03.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 03.10.2013 | |
AT | 26.02.2020 | ||
CY | 26.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
MT | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
TR | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
IE | 03.10.2020 | ||
LU | 03.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 26.02.2020 | |
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
TR | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
IE | 03.10.2020 | ||
LU | 03.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 26.02.2020 | |
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
IE | 03.10.2020 | ||
LU | 03.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 26.02.2020 | |
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
LU | 03.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AT | 26.02.2020 | |
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
LU | 03.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AT | 26.02.2020 | |
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 26.02.2020 | |
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | HR | 26.02.2020 | |
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | HR | 26.02.2020 | |
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | HR | 26.02.2020 | |
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | HR | 26.02.2020 | |
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | HR | 26.02.2020 | |
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | HR | 26.02.2020 | |
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XDYI]WO2005106827 (SYSTEM TEXT AB [SE], et al) [XD] 1,3,5,7-11,16-18 * page 6 - page 7 * [Y] 6,12-15 [I] 2,4; | [Y]GB2195486 (ZIGN LITE SCANDINAVIA) [Y] 6 * the whole document *; | [YD]WO2008097151 (SYSTEMTEXT AB [SE], et al) [YD] 12-15 * page 13, line 8 - line 11 *; | [A]US6395408 (NELSON DANIEL C [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * paragraph [0016] *; | [AD]WO02067230 (SYSTEM TEXT AB [SE], et al) [AD] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [A]JPS6032695 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 1-18 * abstract * | Examination | GB2147542 | by applicant | WO02067230 | WO2005106827 | WO2008097151 | US2002150721 |