EP2719622 - Airplane seat [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.10.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.11.2016 [2016/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Loher, Roland Josef-Bachl-Str. 4 94522 Wallersdorf-Haidlfing / DE | [2014/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2014/16] | Representative(s) | advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft Tappe mbB Bahnhofstrasse 5 94315 Straubing / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/16] | advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bahnhofstrasse 5 94315 Straubing / DE | Application number, filing date | 13187510.6 | 07.10.2013 | [2014/16] | Priority number, date | DE201210109597 | 09.10.2012 Original published format: DE102012109597 | [2014/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2719622 | Date: | 16.04.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/16] | Classification | IPC: | B64D11/06 | [2014/16] | CPC: |
B64D11/06 (EP,US);
B60N2/39 (EP,US);
B60N2/7035 (EP,US);
B60N2/914 (EP,US);
B64D11/0647 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Flugzeugsitz | [2014/16] | English: | Airplane seat | [2014/16] | French: | Siège d'avion | [2014/16] | Examination procedure | 03.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/47] | 22.06.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/47] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2015 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |