EP2859979 - Repair of surfaces by means of a solder/base material mixture and component [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.03.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.04.2016 [2016/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2015/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arjakine, Nikolai Bochumer Str. 27 10555 Berlin / DE | 02 /
Burbaum, Bernd Jenaer Str. 23 14612 Falkensee / DE | 03 /
Jokisch, Torsten Körnerstrasse 9 15366 Neuenhagen bei Berlin / DE | 04 /
Laux, Britta Philippistr. 14 14059 Berlin / DE | 05 /
Lorenz, Stephan Clara-Zetkin-Strasse 100 14612 Falkensee / DE | 06 /
Piegert, Sebastian Ansbacher Strasse 66 10777 Berlin / DE | 07 /
Reinkensmeier, Ingo Hassleistr. 55 58730 Fröndenberg / DE | [2015/16] | Application number, filing date | 13187753.2 | 08.10.2013 | [2015/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2859979 | Date: | 15.04.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B23K1/00, B23K35/30, B23P6/00, B23P15/02, B23K26/34, C23C4/08, C23C4/12, F01D5/00 | [2015/16] | CPC: |
B23P6/007 (EP);
B23K1/0018 (EP);
B23K35/0222 (EP);
B23K35/30 (EP);
B23K35/3033 (EP);
B23K35/304 (EP);
B23K35/3046 (EP);
C23C24/04 (EP);
C23C4/073 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Reparatur von Flächen mittels eines Lot/Grundwerkstoffgemischs und Bauteil | [2015/16] | English: | Repair of surfaces by means of a solder/base material mixture and component | [2015/16] | French: | Réparation de surfaces au moyen d'un mélange brasage/matériau de base et composant | [2015/16] | Examination procedure | 08.10.2013 | Examination requested [2015/16] | 16.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/17] | 24.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/17] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2015 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP1743951 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [X] 1,4-6,8,9 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0010]; claims 15-17,19,21 * [A] 2,3; | [X]EP2279826 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 1,2,4-6,8-10 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0017]; claim 1 * * paragraph [0113] *; | [XA]EP1772228 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,3-6,9 * paragraphs [0047] , [0051] - paragraph [0052]; figures 4-7; claims 1-3 * [A] 10-13; | [X]EP2369131 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 10-13 * paragraphs [0018] , [0035] - paragraph [0036]; claim 7 * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0048] *; | [X]EP1967313 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [X] 10-13 * paragraphs [0051] - [0061]; claims 1-20 *; | [A]EP0009210 (GOETZE AG [DE]) [A] 1-3 * claims 1,2 *; | [A]US3073269 (HOPPIN III GEORGE SIDNEY, et al) [A] 1,2,5,6,8,9 * claims 1,2 *; | [A]DE102004026490 (BACH FRIEDRICH-WILHELM [DE]) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0008] * |