EP2719813 - Laundry treatment machine and method of operating the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.2019 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.04.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.09.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeoungdeungpo-gu Seoul, 150-721 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/16] | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeoungdeungpo-gu Seoul, 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jang, Minho 391-2 Gaeumjung-dong Changwon-si 641-110 Kyungsangnam-do / KR | 02 /
Kim, Kyunghoon 391-2 Gaeumjung-dong Changwon-si 641-110 Kyungsangnam-do / KR | 03 /
Lee, Hoonbong 391-2 Gaeumjung-dong Changwon-si 641-110 Kyungsangnam-do / KR | [2014/16] | Representative(s) | Noble, Nicholas, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2018/20] |
Former [2014/16] | Noble, Nicholas, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 13187795.3 | 08.10.2013 | [2014/16] | Priority number, date | KR20120111789 | 09.10.2012 Original published format: KR 20120111789 | [2014/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2719813 | Date: | 16.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2719813 | Date: | 24.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2719813 | Date: | 16.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | D06F39/00 | [2016/08] | CPC: |
D06F33/32 (EP,CN,US);
D06F34/18 (EP,CN,US);
D06F37/304 (CN);
D06F2103/46 (EP,CN,US);
D06F2105/00 (EP,CN,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/16] | D06F39/00, D06F33/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/16] | Title | German: | Wäschebehandlungsmaschine und Betriebsverfahren dafür | [2014/16] | English: | Laundry treatment machine and method of operating the same | [2014/16] | French: | Machine de traitement du linge et son procédé de fonctionnement | [2014/16] | Examination procedure | 08.10.2013 | Examination requested [2014/16] | 24.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 29.03.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.03.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.01.2017 | Opposition(s) | 19.02.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/17] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 29.03.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 29.03.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.04.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.10.2013 | AL | 16.05.2018 | AT | 16.05.2018 | CY | 16.05.2018 | CZ | 16.05.2018 | DK | 16.05.2018 | EE | 16.05.2018 | ES | 16.05.2018 | FI | 16.05.2018 | HR | 16.05.2018 | IT | 16.05.2018 | LT | 16.05.2018 | LV | 16.05.2018 | MC | 16.05.2018 | MK | 16.05.2018 | NL | 16.05.2018 | PL | 16.05.2018 | PT | 16.05.2018 | RO | 16.05.2018 | RS | 16.05.2018 | SE | 16.05.2018 | SI | 16.05.2018 | SK | 16.05.2018 | SM | 16.05.2018 | TR | 16.05.2018 | BG | 16.08.2018 | NO | 16.08.2018 | GR | 17.08.2018 | IS | 16.09.2018 | IE | 08.10.2018 | LU | 08.10.2018 | MT | 08.10.2018 | BE | 31.10.2018 | CH | 31.10.2018 | LI | 31.10.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 08.10.2013 | |
AL | 16.05.2018 | ||
AT | 16.05.2018 | ||
CY | 16.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
IT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
MK | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PT | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
TR | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
IE | 08.10.2018 | ||
LU | 08.10.2018 | ||
MT | 08.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 08.10.2013 | |
AL | 16.05.2018 | ||
AT | 16.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
IT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PT | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
TR | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
IE | 08.10.2018 | ||
LU | 08.10.2018 | ||
MT | 08.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 16.05.2018 | |
AT | 16.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
IT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PT | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
TR | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
IE | 08.10.2018 | ||
LU | 08.10.2018 | ||
MT | 08.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 16.05.2018 | |
AT | 16.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
IT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
TR | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
IE | 08.10.2018 | ||
LU | 08.10.2018 | ||
MT | 08.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 16.05.2018 | |
AT | 16.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
IT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
IE | 08.10.2018 | ||
LU | 08.10.2018 | ||
MT | 08.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 16.05.2018 | |
AT | 16.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
IT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
IE | 08.10.2018 | ||
LU | 08.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
IT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
IE | 08.10.2018 | ||
LU | 08.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
IT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
LU | 08.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
IT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
LU | 08.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
IT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
LU | 08.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/28] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
IT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
IT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
IT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 16.05.2018 | |
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | DK | 16.05.2018 | |
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | ES | 16.05.2018 | |
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | ES | 16.05.2018 | |
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | ES | 16.05.2018 | |
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | ES | 16.05.2018 | |
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 16.05.2018 | |
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE69021458T (CIAPEM [FR]) [X] 1,2,6,7,9,12,13,15 * page 3, line 21 - page 10, line 20 * * claim 1 * * figures 1-3 * [I] 3-5,10,11,14; | [XI]DE4431846 (AKO WERKE GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1,6,8,9,12 * column 1, line 50 - column 5, line 13 * * figures 1-3 * [I] 3-5,10,11,14; | [X]DE10305675 (DIEHL AKO STIFTUNG GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1,6 * paragraphs [0004] - [0012] * * figure 1 *; | [A]US2005015890 (KIM TAE-KYOUNG [KR], et al) [A] 1,12 * paragraphs [0034] - [0058] ** figures 1-8 *; | [A]EP2090870 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1,6,7,12,13,15 * paragraphs [0039] - [0057] * * figures 4-8 *; | [A]EP2354296 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1,2,6,12 * paragraphs [0051] - [0095] * * figures 1-13 * |