EP2722723 - Actuator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.09.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.10.2018 [2018/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Karl Dungs GmbH & Co.KG Karl-Dungs-Platz 1 73660 Urbach / DE | [2017/35] |
Former [2014/17] | For all designated states Karl Dungs GmbH & Co.KG Siemensstrasse 6-10 73660 Urbach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bathke, Lars Alte Steige 18 73614 Schorndorf / DE | [2014/17] | Representative(s) | Rüger Abel Patentanwälte PartGmbB Webergasse 3 73728 Esslingen a. N. / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/17] | Rüger, Barthelt & Abel Webergasse 3 73728 Esslingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 13188089.0 | 10.10.2013 | [2014/17] | Priority number, date | DE201210109977 | 19.10.2012 Original published format: DE102012109977 | [2014/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2722723 | Date: | 23.04.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2722723 | Date: | 01.11.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G05D16/10, G05D16/06, F15B15/20 | [2017/44] | CPC: |
G05D16/0638 (EP);
G05D16/103 (CN,US);
F15B15/20 (US)
|
Former IPC [2014/17] | G05D16/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Regelstellglied | [2014/17] | English: | Actuator | [2014/17] | French: | Organe de réglage | [2014/17] | Examination procedure | 01.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/42] | 08.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2017 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US308756 (E. R. DINGLEY) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [XYI]US359948 (G. T. WILSON) [X] 1,4,7,9,10 * the whole document * [Y] 5,6,8,11,12 [I] 2,3; | [XYI]US1938943 (TERRY CHARLES M) [X] 1,4,7-10 * the whole document * [Y] 5,6,8,11,12 [I] 2,3; | [Y]US4526192 (DIXON ROBERT W [US]) [Y] 5,6 * the whole document *; | [YD]DE4008493 (JCI REGELUNGSTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [YD] 11,12* the whole document * | by applicant | DE4008493 |