Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
29.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.08.2016 [2016/35] |
21.08.2015 | (Expected) grant | published on 23.09.2015 [2015/39] |
17.08.2015 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | |
17.08.2015 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | |
14.08.2015 | New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | |
27.04.2015 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
05.02.2015 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
17.10.2014 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
15.10.2014 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
03.10.2014 | First examination report | |
07.03.2014 | Request for examination filed | published on 09.04.2014 [2014/15] |
07.03.2014 | Change - designated states | published on 09.04.2014 [2014/15] |
14.01.2014 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 15.01.2014 [2014/03] |
14.10.2013 | New entry: Renewal fee paid |