EP2740927 - Fuel injector valve for combustion engines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.2016 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2014/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kreschel, Henning Vorhofstr. 12 71640 Ludwigsburg / DE | 02 /
Grimminger, Christian Berghalde 33 71229 Leonberg / DE | 03 /
Rapp, Holger Birkenweg 22 71254 Ditzingen / DE | 04 /
Beier, Marco Bertastr. 31 70469 Stuttgart-Feuerbach / DE | [2014/24] | Application number, filing date | 13188371.2 | 11.10.2013 | [2014/24] | Priority number, date | DE201210222633 | 10.12.2012 Original published format: DE102012222633 | [2014/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2740927 | Date: | 11.06.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2740927 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F02M63/00, F02M47/02, F02M61/04 | [2014/24] | CPC: |
F02M47/027 (EP);
F02M45/12 (EP);
F02M63/0029 (EP);
F02M63/0045 (EP);
F02M2200/28 (EP);
F02M2200/46 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] |
Former [2014/24] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Kraftstoffeinspritzventil für Brennkraftmaschinen | [2014/24] | English: | Fuel injector valve for combustion engines | [2014/24] | French: | Soupape d'injection de carburant pour moteurs à combustion interne | [2014/24] | Examination procedure | 11.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/04] | 29.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 12.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.09.2015 | Opposition(s) | 21.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.10.2013 | AL | 20.01.2016 | CY | 20.01.2016 | CZ | 20.01.2016 | DK | 20.01.2016 | EE | 20.01.2016 | ES | 20.01.2016 | FI | 20.01.2016 | HR | 20.01.2016 | LT | 20.01.2016 | LV | 20.01.2016 | MC | 20.01.2016 | MK | 20.01.2016 | MT | 20.01.2016 | NL | 20.01.2016 | PL | 20.01.2016 | RO | 20.01.2016 | RS | 20.01.2016 | SE | 20.01.2016 | SI | 20.01.2016 | SK | 20.01.2016 | SM | 20.01.2016 | TR | 20.01.2016 | BG | 20.04.2016 | NO | 20.04.2016 | GR | 21.04.2016 | IS | 20.05.2016 | PT | 20.05.2016 | IE | 11.10.2016 | LU | 11.10.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 11.10.2013 | |
CY | 20.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2016 | ||
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
MC | 20.01.2016 | ||
MK | 20.01.2016 | ||
MT | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RO | 20.01.2016 | ||
RS | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
SI | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
SM | 20.01.2016 | ||
TR | 20.01.2016 | ||
BG | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
IE | 11.10.2016 | ||
LU | 11.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/32] | HU | 11.10.2013 | |
CY | 20.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2016 | ||
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
MC | 20.01.2016 | ||
MK | 20.01.2016 | ||
MT | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RO | 20.01.2016 | ||
RS | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
SI | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
SM | 20.01.2016 | ||
BG | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
IE | 11.10.2016 | ||
LU | 11.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 11.10.2013 | |
CZ | 20.01.2016 | ||
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
MC | 20.01.2016 | ||
MK | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RO | 20.01.2016 | ||
RS | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
SI | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
SM | 20.01.2016 | ||
BG | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
IE | 11.10.2016 | ||
LU | 11.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/51] | CZ | 20.01.2016 | |
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RO | 20.01.2016 | ||
RS | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
SI | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
SM | 20.01.2016 | ||
BG | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
IE | 11.10.2016 | ||
LU | 11.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | CZ | 20.01.2016 | |
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RO | 20.01.2016 | ||
RS | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
SI | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
SM | 20.01.2016 | ||
BG | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
LU | 11.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/16] | CZ | 20.01.2016 | |
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RO | 20.01.2016 | ||
RS | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
SI | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
SM | 20.01.2016 | ||
BG | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | CZ | 20.01.2016 | |
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RO | 20.01.2016 | ||
RS | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
SM | 20.01.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | DK | 20.01.2016 | |
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RS | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | DK | 20.01.2016 | |
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RS | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | ES | 20.01.2016 | |
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RS | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | ES | 20.01.2016 | |
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | ES | 20.01.2016 | |
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 20.01.2016 | |
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/30] | NL | 20.01.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003010845 (CARROLL JOHN T [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9 * abstract * * claim 1 * * claim 2 * * claim 14 * * claim 5 * * claim 10 * * paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0037] *; | [X]DE102004030445 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * claim 1 * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0016] *; | [X]DE10348925 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,3-5,9,10 * abstract * * claim 1 * * claim 2 * * claim 3 * * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0014] *; | [X]WO2007038811 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,6,7,9 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0031] * * claim 1 * * claim 2 * * claim 3 * * claim 4 * * claim 8 * * claim 9 * * claim 10 * * claim 11 * * claim 12 * * claim 13 *; | [X]EP2189649 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4 * abstract * * claim 1 * * claim 2 * * claim 3 * * claim 7 * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0073] * * paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0063] * * paragraph [0064] *; | [XA]JP2010151025 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1,2,4,5 * abstract * * claim 1 * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0016] * [A] 8; | [A]US2006186227 (AUGUSTIN ULRICH [US]) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * claim 1 * * claim 4 * * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0039] * | by applicant | DE102010003202 | DE20091055036 |