EP2723082 - Image encoding apparatus and image encoding method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.03.2017 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.04.2017 [2017/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2014/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hattori, Hideaki c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2014/17] | Representative(s) | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Canon Europe Ltd European Patent Department 3 The Square Stockley Park Uxbridge Middlesex UB11 1ET / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/17] | Northway, Daniel Robert Canon Europe Ltd European Patent Department 3 The Square Stockley Park Uxbridge, Middlesex UB11 1ET / GB | Application number, filing date | 13188633.5 | 15.10.2013 | [2014/17] | Priority number, date | JP20120229242 | 16.10.2012 Original published format: JP 2012229242 | [2014/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2723082 | Date: | 23.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2723082 | Date: | 22.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/43] |
Former [2014/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | |
No.: | EP2723082 | ||
Date: | |||
Status: | (deleted) | ||
[2014/34] | |||
[2014/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/14, H04N19/18, H04N19/12, H04N19/107, H04N19/137, H04N19/176, H04N19/149, H04N19/124, H04N19/11, H04N19/593 | [2014/21] | CPC: |
H04N19/52 (EP,US);
H04N19/59 (KR);
H04N19/107 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/11 (EP,US);
H04N19/12 (EP,US);
H04N19/124 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/137 (EP,US);
H04N19/14 (EP,US);
H04N19/149 (EP,US);
H04N19/176 (KR,US);
H04N19/18 (EP,US);
H04N19/593 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/23] |
Former [2014/17] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Bildkodierungsvorrichtung und Bildkodierungsverfahren | [2014/17] | English: | Image encoding apparatus and image encoding method | [2014/17] | French: | Appareil de codage d'image et procédé de codage d'image | [2014/17] | Examination procedure | 21.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/23] | 17.03.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2004080084 (AGENCY SCIENCE TECH & RES [SG], et al) [X] 1,15-17 * page 8, line 6 - page 10, line 5 *; | [X]US2006198439 (ZHU QIN-FAN [US]) [X] 1,15-17 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0061] * * figures 6,7 *; | [A]US2008107183 (CHATTERJEE CHANCHAL [US]) [A] 1-3,5,6,15-17 * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0045] * * figure 2 *; | [XI] - XIN ZHOU ET AL, "Fast intra prediction mode selection algorithm of H. 264/AVC based on all-zero blocks detection", APPLICATION RESEARCH OF COMPUTERS, (20110701), vol. 28, no. 7, doi:10.3969/j.issn.1001-3695.2011.07.103, pages 2765 - 2769, XP055098171 [X] 1,2,6,15-17 * sections 3.2 and 3.3 * [I] 3,5 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3969/j.issn.1001-3695.2011.07.103 | [A] - RICHARDSON IAN E G, "H.264 / MPEG-4 Part 10 White Paper, Transform and quantization", INTERNET CITATION, (20030319), pages 1 - 9, URL: http://www.vcodex.com/files/h264_transform.pdf, (20100528), XP002585108 [A] 1-3,5,6,15-17 * sections 1, 2 and 2.1 * | [A] - RICHARDSON IAIN E G, "H.264/MPEG-4 part 10: Intra Prediction", INTERNET CITATION, (20021007), URL: www.vcodex.com, (20021007), XP002973807 [A] 1-3,5,6,15-17 * section 3 * | [A] - YU Y ET AL, "A fast intra_4 4 mode selection method for H.264", VISUAL COMMUNICATIONS AND IMAGE PROCESSING; 20-1-2009 - 22-1-2009; SAN JOSE,, (20090120), XP030081759 [A] 1-3,5,6,15-17 * section 3 * | [A] - ZHANG J ET AL, "All-zero block detection for H.264 intra prediction", VISUAL COMMUNICATIONS AND IMAGE PROCESSING; 12-7-2005 - 15-7-2005; BEIJING,, (20050712), XP030081053 [A] 1-3,5,6,15-17 * section 3 * | [A] - YUN WU ET AL, "All Zero Block Detection Based on Statistics for AVS-M Intra Frame Prediction", INTELLIGENT INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY APPLICATION WORKSHOPS, 2008. IITAW '08. INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20081221), ISBN 978-0-7695-3505-0, pages 566 - 569, XP031382855 [A] 1-3,5,6,15-17 * sections 2 and 3 * | [A] - JUN SUNG PARK ET AL, "Fast selective intra mode decision in H.264/AVC", CONSUMER COMMUNICATIONS AND NETWORKING CONFERENCE, 2006. CCNC 2006. 20 06 3RD IEEE LAS VEGAS, NV, USA 8-10 JAN. 2006, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20060108), vol. 2, ISBN 978-1-4244-0085-0, pages 1068 - 1072, XP010893339 [A] 1-3,5,6,15-17 * section III * | by applicant | JP2008154060 |