EP2725359 - Cell separation method using a release system for cell-antibody-substrate conjugates containing a polyethylene glycol spacer unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Miltenyi Biotec GmbH Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 68 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [2014/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dose, Christian, Dr. Miltenyi Biotec GmbH Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 68 D-51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | 02 /
Brieden, Jennifer Miltenyi Biotec GmbH Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 68 D-51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [2014/18] | Representative(s) | Kisters, Michael Marcus Miltenyi Biotec B.V. & Co. KG Friedrich-Ebert Strasse 68 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/18] | Kisters, Michael Marcus Patentanwalt Miltenyi Biotec GmbH Corporate Legal Department Friedrich-Ebert Strasse 68 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 13188639.2 | 15.10.2013 | [2014/18] | Priority number, date | EP20120189516 | 23.10.2012 Original published format: EP 12189516 | [2014/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2725359 | Date: | 30.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2725359 | Date: | 27.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/532, G01N33/543, A61K47/48 | [2014/18] | CPC: |
G01N33/54333 (EP,US);
G01N33/56972 (US);
G01N33/532 (EP,US);
G01N33/54353 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/22] |
Former [2014/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Zelltrennungsverfahren mit einem Freisetzungssystem für Zell-Antikörper-Substrat-Konjugate mit einer Polyethylenglycol-Distanzeinheit | [2014/18] | English: | Cell separation method using a release system for cell-antibody-substrate conjugates containing a polyethylene glycol spacer unit | [2014/18] | French: | Procédé de séparation de cellule utilisant un système de libération pour conjugués cellule-anticorps-substrat contenant une unité d'espacement de polyéthylène glycol | [2014/18] | Examination procedure | 02.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.10.2014 | Examination requested [2014/46] | 25.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.04.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.11.2014 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/18] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.10.2013 | AL | 27.05.2015 | AT | 27.05.2015 | CY | 27.05.2015 | CZ | 27.05.2015 | DK | 27.05.2015 | EE | 27.05.2015 | FI | 27.05.2015 | HR | 27.05.2015 | LT | 27.05.2015 | LV | 27.05.2015 | MC | 27.05.2015 | MK | 27.05.2015 | MT | 27.05.2015 | PL | 27.05.2015 | RO | 27.05.2015 | RS | 27.05.2015 | SE | 27.05.2015 | SI | 27.05.2015 | SK | 27.05.2015 | SM | 27.05.2015 | TR | 27.05.2015 | BG | 27.08.2015 | NO | 27.08.2015 | GR | 28.08.2015 | IS | 27.09.2015 | PT | 28.09.2015 | IE | 15.10.2015 | LU | 15.10.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 15.10.2013 | |
AT | 27.05.2015 | ||
CY | 27.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2015 | ||
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
MC | 27.05.2015 | ||
MK | 27.05.2015 | ||
MT | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
RS | 27.05.2015 | ||
SE | 27.05.2015 | ||
SI | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
SM | 27.05.2015 | ||
TR | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
IE | 15.10.2015 | ||
LU | 15.10.2015 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 15.10.2013 | |
AT | 27.05.2015 | ||
CY | 27.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2015 | ||
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
MC | 27.05.2015 | ||
MK | 27.05.2015 | ||
MT | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
RS | 27.05.2015 | ||
SE | 27.05.2015 | ||
SI | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
SM | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
IE | 15.10.2015 | ||
LU | 15.10.2015 | ||
Former [2017/40] | HU | 15.10.2013 | |
AT | 27.05.2015 | ||
CY | 27.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2015 | ||
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
MC | 27.05.2015 | ||
MT | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
RS | 27.05.2015 | ||
SE | 27.05.2015 | ||
SI | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
IE | 15.10.2015 | ||
LU | 15.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 27.05.2015 | |
CZ | 27.05.2015 | ||
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
MC | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
RS | 27.05.2015 | ||
SI | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
IE | 15.10.2015 | ||
LU | 15.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 27.05.2015 | |
CZ | 27.05.2015 | ||
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
MC | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
RS | 27.05.2015 | ||
SI | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
LU | 15.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/26] | AT | 27.05.2015 | |
CZ | 27.05.2015 | ||
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
RS | 27.05.2015 | ||
SI | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
LU | 15.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 27.05.2015 | |
CZ | 27.05.2015 | ||
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
RS | 27.05.2015 | ||
SI | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | AT | 27.05.2015 | |
CZ | 27.05.2015 | ||
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
RS | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 27.05.2015 | |
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
RS | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 27.05.2015 | |
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
RS | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 27.05.2015 | |
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
RS | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | FI | 27.05.2015 | |
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
RS | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | FI | 27.05.2015 | |
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
RS | 27.05.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XDA]US5332679 (SIMONS DONALD M [US], et al) [XD] 1-7 * the whole document * * example 3 * * column 10; table 1 * [A] 8-13; | [YD]US5518882 (LUND GARRY [CA], et al) [YD] 1-13 * the whole document * * claim 1 * * figure 2 ** column 7, lines 40-51 *; | [XY] - SHAN KE ET AL, "Avidin-Biotin-PEG-CPA Complexes as Potential EPR-Directed Therapeutic Protein Carriers: Preparation and Characterization", BIOCONJUGATE CHEMISTRY, (20070901), vol. 18, no. 5, doi:10.1021/bc700182t, ISSN 1043-1802, pages 1644 - 1650, XP055050030 [X] 1-7 * the whole document * * figures 1, 2 * * page 1645, column 1 - page 1646, column 1 * * page 1648, column 2 * [Y] 1-13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bc700182t | [XA] - KE S ET AL, "Intermolecular interaction of avidin and PEGylated biotin", BIOCONJUGATE CHEMISTRY, ACS, WASHINGTON, DC, US, vol. 18, no. 6, doi:10.1021/BC700204K, ISSN 1043-1802, (20071121), pages 2109 - 2114, (20071019), XP002573017 [X] 1-7 * the whole document * * abstract * [A] 8-13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bc700204k | [XA] - RAMPERSAUD A A ET AL, "Novel discrete PEG-based crosslinking reagents for conjugation of antibodies and proteins to biotin, fluorochromes, enzymes and gold that eliminate aggregation, improves solubility, reduces non-specific binding and enhances low level detection limits", MOLECULAR BIOLOGY OF THE CELL, & ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN-SOCIETY-FOR-CELL-BIOLOGY (ASCB); DENVER, CO, USA; DECEMBER 03 -07, 2011, (2011), vol. 22, ISSN 1059-1524, page 1931, XP055050022 [X] 1-4 * the whole document * * figures 1,7 * [A] 5-13 | by applicant | US4656252 | WO9216841 | US5215927 | US5506121 | US5518882 | US6869606 | US2008255004 | - M. QURESHI ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2001), vol. 276, pages 46422 - 46428 | - T. SANO ET AL., PROC.NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1995), vol. 92, pages 3180 - 3184 | - ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, (2002), vol. 308, pages 343 - 357 | - KE SHAN ET AL., "Avidin-Biotin-PEG-CPA Complexes as Potential EPR-Directed Therapeutic Protein Carriers: Preparation and Characterization", BIOCONJUGATE CHEMISTRY, (20070901), vol. 18, no. 5, pages 1644 - 1650 | - "Intermolecular interaction of avidin and PEGylated biotin", BIOCONJUGATE CHEMISTRY, (20071121), vol. 18, no. 6, pages 2109 - 2114 | - JAMES HIRSCH ET AL., ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, (2002), vol. 308, pages 343 - 357 |