EP2722876 - Embedded chip packages and methods for manufacturing an embedded chip package [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 15.02.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 20.03.2019 [2019/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG Am Campeon 1-12 85579 Neubiberg / DE | [2014/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beer, Gottfried Hochrainstraße 8 93152 Nittendorf / DE | 02 /
Hartner, Walter Weichser Weg 1 93077 Bad Abbach-Peissing / DE | [2014/17] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/17] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | Application number, filing date | 13189068.3 | 17.10.2013 | [2014/17] | Priority number, date | EP20120007249 | 19.10.2012 Original published format: EP 12007249 | US201313736097 | 08.01.2013 Original published format: US201313736097 | [2014/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2722876 | Date: | 23.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2722876 | Date: | 27.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/538 | [2016/17] | CPC: |
H01L23/5389 (EP);
H01L24/24 (EP);
H01L24/82 (EP);
H01L24/96 (EP);
H01L24/97 (EP);
H01Q1/2283 (EP);
H01L2223/6627 (EP);
H01L2223/6677 (EP);
H01L2223/6683 (EP);
H01L2224/0401 (EP);
H01L2224/04105 (EP);
H01L2224/12105 (EP);
H01L2224/16225 (EP);
H01L2224/24195 (EP);
H01L2224/32145 (EP);
H01L2224/32245 (EP);
H01L2224/48227 (EP);
H01L2224/73267 (EP);
H01L2224/97 (EP);
H01L2225/06562 (EP);
H01L2225/1035 (EP);
H01L2225/1041 (EP);
H01L23/3128 (EP);
H01L23/49816 (EP);
H01L23/5384 (EP);
H01L23/66 (EP);
H01L24/16 (EP);
H01L24/32 (EP);
H01L24/48 (EP);
H01L24/73 (EP);
H01L25/105 (EP);
H01L25/16 (EP);
H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2924/12042 (EP);
H01L2924/1423 (EP);
H01L2924/1431 (EP);
H01L2924/1434 (EP);
H01L2924/1461 (EP);
H01L2924/15311 (EP);
H01L2924/181 (EP);
H01L2924/19041 (EP);
H01L2924/19042 (EP);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/97, H01L2224/82 (EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/45015, H01L2924/207 (EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/45099 (EP);
H01L2924/12042, H01L2924/00 (EP); |
Former IPC [2014/17] | H01L23/00, H01L23/538 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/49] |
Former [2014/17] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Eingebettete Chipgehäuse und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines eingebetteten Chipgehäuses | [2014/17] | English: | Embedded chip packages and methods for manufacturing an embedded chip package | [2014/17] | French: | Boîtiers de puce intégré et procédés de fabrication d'un tel boîtier | [2014/17] | Examination procedure | 17.10.2013 | Examination requested [2014/17] | 27.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 26.10.2018 | 26.10.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 02.11.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/12] | 12.11.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/12] | Divisional application(s) | EP18198666.2 / EP3444840 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.06.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2018 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2012020044 (IIHOLA ANTTI [FI], et al) [X] 1-13* paragraphs [0079] , [8082] , [0085] , [0086] , [0119] , [0125] , [0140]; figures 4b,18-26 * |