EP2724944 - Motorisation system for articulation having crossed winding means with reliable bearing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.02.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.12.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thales Tour Carpe Diem Place des Corolles Esplanade Nord 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2019/15] |
Former [2014/18] | For all designated states Thales 45, rue de Villiers 92200 Neuilly Sur Seine / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baudasse, Yannick THALES ALENIA SPACE 5 Allée des Gabians 06150 Cannes-La-Bocca / FR | 02 /
Vezain, Stéphane THALES ALENIA SPACE 5 Allée des Gabians 06150 Cannes-La-Bocca / FR | 03 /
Stanek, Didier THALES ALENIA SPACE 5 Allée des Gabians 06150 Cannes-La-Bocca / FR | [2014/18] | Representative(s) | Esselin, Sophie, et al Marks & Clerk France Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Immeuble Visium 22 Avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2019/15] | Esselin, Sophie, et al Marks & Clerk France Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Immeuble Visium 22 avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2014/18] | Nguyen, Dominique, et al Marks & Clerk France Immeuble Visium 22, avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 13189070.9 | 17.10.2013 | [2014/18] | Priority number, date | FR20120002860 | 26.10.2012 Original published format: FR 1202860 | [2014/18] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2724944 | Date: | 30.04.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2724944 | Date: | 03.01.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2724944 | Date: | 10.04.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B64G1/22, F16C11/12, E04H12/08, E04H12/18, // E05D1/02, B64G1/44, B25J17/02 | [2018/01] | CPC: |
B64G1/2229 (EP);
B64G1/222 (US);
E04H12/187 (US);
B64G1/44 (EP,US);
Y10T74/18568 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/18] | B64G1/22, F16C11/12, // E05D1/02, B64G1/44, B25J17/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/32] |
Former [2014/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Motorisierungssystem für Gelenk mit gekreuzten Aufrollmitteln mit zuverlässigem Rollverhalten | [2014/18] | English: | Motorisation system for articulation having crossed winding means with reliable bearing | [2014/18] | French: | Système de motorisation pour articulation à moyens d'enroulement croisés avec roulement fiabilisé | [2014/18] | Examination procedure | 17.10.2013 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/32] | 17.12.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.02.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.12.2018 | Opposition(s) | 13.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.10.2013 | AL | 10.04.2019 | AT | 10.04.2019 | CY | 10.04.2019 | CZ | 10.04.2019 | DK | 10.04.2019 | EE | 10.04.2019 | FI | 10.04.2019 | HR | 10.04.2019 | LT | 10.04.2019 | LV | 10.04.2019 | MC | 10.04.2019 | MK | 10.04.2019 | MT | 10.04.2019 | PL | 10.04.2019 | RO | 10.04.2019 | RS | 10.04.2019 | SE | 10.04.2019 | SI | 10.04.2019 | SK | 10.04.2019 | SM | 10.04.2019 | TR | 10.04.2019 | BG | 10.07.2019 | NO | 10.07.2019 | GR | 11.07.2019 | IS | 10.08.2019 | PT | 10.09.2019 | IE | 17.10.2019 | LU | 17.10.2019 | BE | 31.10.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 17.10.2013 | |
AL | 10.04.2019 | ||
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CY | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
MC | 10.04.2019 | ||
MT | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
SI | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
SM | 10.04.2019 | ||
TR | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
IE | 17.10.2019 | ||
LU | 17.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 17.10.2013 | |
AL | 10.04.2019 | ||
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CY | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
MC | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
SI | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
SM | 10.04.2019 | ||
TR | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
IE | 17.10.2019 | ||
LU | 17.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CY | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
MC | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
SI | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
SM | 10.04.2019 | ||
TR | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
IE | 17.10.2019 | ||
LU | 17.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
MC | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
SI | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
SM | 10.04.2019 | ||
TR | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
IE | 17.10.2019 | ||
LU | 17.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
MC | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
SI | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
SM | 10.04.2019 | ||
TR | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
LU | 17.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
MC | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
SI | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
SM | 10.04.2019 | ||
TR | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
LU | 17.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
MC | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
SI | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
SM | 10.04.2019 | ||
TR | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
SI | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
SM | 10.04.2019 | ||
TR | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
SM | 10.04.2019 | ||
TR | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
SM | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | FI | 10.04.2019 | |
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | FI | 10.04.2019 | |
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4073201 (TAYLOR HENRY JAMES, et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 29 - line 38 ** column 4, line 5 - line 33; figures 2,5 *; | [A]WO8302795 (COURIER DISPLAY SYST [GB]) [A] 1 * page 11, line 3 - line 17; figures 7,8 *; | [A]US4558911 (RUOFF CARL F [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 33 - line 43; figures 1,4 *; | [A]FR2795465 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 26 - page 4, line 10; figures 1,2 *; | [XAI]FR2902763 (ALCATEL SA [FR]) [X] 1,2,5,7-9 * page 1, line 1 - line 6 * * page 5, line 16 - line 24; figures 1-4 * [A] 4 [I] 3,6; | [AD]FR2968234 (THALES SA [FR]) [AD] 1 * page 5, line 9 - page 6, line 10; figure 2 * | by applicant | FR605653 | FR2635077 | FR2968234 |