EP2763386 - Method and system to provide priority indicating calls [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.09.2019 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.06.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.10.2019 [2019/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/32] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (Publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Xing, Bo 5997 Roxie Terrace Fremont, CA California 94555 / US | 02 /
Wang, Yi-Pin Eric 1357 Grosventres Ct. Fremont, CA California 94539 / US | [2014/32] | Representative(s) | Brann AB P.O. Box 3690 Sveavägen 63 103 59 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/32] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13189082.4 | 17.10.2013 | [2014/32] | Priority number, date | US201213658744 | 23.10.2012 Original published format: US201213658744 | [2014/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2763386 | Date: | 06.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04M3/436, H04M3/493 | [2014/32] | CPC: |
H04M3/436 (EP,US);
H04M3/4936 (EP,US);
H04M2203/2005 (EP,US);
H04M2203/2011 (EP,US);
H04M2203/4563 (EP,US);
H04M2203/556 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur Bereitstellung von prioritätsanzeigenden Anrufen | [2014/32] | English: | Method and system to provide priority indicating calls | [2014/32] | French: | Procédé et système pour fournir des appels d'indication de priorité | [2014/32] | Examination procedure | 17.01.2014 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 24.02.2014 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 10.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/09] | 16.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/42] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.05.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0837611 (AT & T CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,8,9,11,12,23,24 * column 1, line 16 - line 47 * * column 4, line 13 - line 52 * * column 5, line 55 - column 12, line 14; figures 1,2,3,4a,4b,4c *[I] 3-7,10,13-22; | [E]EP2654279 (JAJAH LTD [IL]) [E] 1-24 * figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraphs [0012] , [0013] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0052] * |