Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP2763386
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
13.09.2019 |
Withdrawal of application |
published on 16.10.2019 [2019/42] |
02.06.2019 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
10.01.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
31.10.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.07.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
31.10.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.09.2017 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
15.09.2017 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
26.05.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
12.05.2017 |
First examination report |
|
06.03.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
31.10.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.11.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.01.2015 |
Change - designated states |
published on 25.02.2015 [2015/09] |
23.01.2015 |
Change - request for examination |
published on 25.02.2015 [2015/09] |
24.09.2014 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
05.08.2014 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 06.08.2014 [2014/32] |
04.07.2014 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 06.08.2014 [2014/32] |
07.06.2014 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect |
|
18.02.2014 |
Change: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
05.02.2014 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit |
|