EP2724895 - Bumper cross member assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.08.2015 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kirchhoff Automotive Deutschland GmbH Am Eckenbach 10-14 57439 Attendorn / DE | [2014/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lenkenhoff, Christian Steinhauser Bergstrasse 31 58332 Schwelm / DE | 02 /
Töller, Marco Lützerathstrasse 158 51107 Köln / DE | [2014/18] | Representative(s) | Haverkamp, Jens Gartenstrasse 61 58636 Iserlohn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/41] | Haverkamp, Jens Patentanwalt Stefanstraße 2 Kirchhoffgebäude 58638 Iserlohn / DE | ||
Former [2014/18] | Haverkamp, Jens Patentanwalt Stefanstraße 2 Kirchhoffgebäude 58638 Iserlohn / DE | Application number, filing date | 13189097.2 | 17.10.2013 | [2014/18] | Priority number, date | DE201220104117U | 26.10.2012 Original published format: DE 202012104117 U | [2014/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2724895 | Date: | 30.04.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2724895 | Date: | 08.10.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B60R19/18, B60R19/34 | [2014/18] | CPC: |
B60R19/18 (EP);
B60R19/34 (EP);
B60R2019/1806 (EP);
B60R2019/242 (EP);
B60R2019/247 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/18] | Title | German: | Stoßfängerquerträgerbaugruppe | [2014/18] | English: | Bumper cross member assembly | [2014/18] | French: | Module de support transversal de pare-chocs | [2014/18] | Examination procedure | 05.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/18] | 26.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.08.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.06.2014 | Opposition(s) | 09.07.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/38] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 08.10.2014 | BG | 08.10.2014 | CY | 08.10.2014 | DK | 08.10.2014 | EE | 08.10.2014 | FI | 08.10.2014 | HR | 08.10.2014 | IT | 08.10.2014 | LT | 08.10.2014 | LV | 08.10.2014 | MC | 08.10.2014 | MK | 08.10.2014 | MT | 08.10.2014 | NL | 08.10.2014 | PL | 08.10.2014 | RO | 08.10.2014 | RS | 08.10.2014 | SE | 08.10.2014 | SI | 08.10.2014 | SK | 08.10.2014 | SM | 08.10.2014 | TR | 08.10.2014 | CZ | 17.10.2014 | LU | 17.10.2014 | NO | 08.01.2015 | GR | 09.01.2015 | IS | 08.02.2015 | PT | 09.02.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/29] | BG | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
IT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
MK | 08.10.2014 | ||
MT | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
RS | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
SM | 08.10.2014 | ||
TR | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2014 | ||
LU | 17.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2018/02] | BG | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
IT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
MT | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
RS | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
TR | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2014 | ||
LU | 17.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | BG | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
IT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
MT | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
RS | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
TR | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | CY | 08.10.2014 | |
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
IT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
RS | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
TR | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 08.10.2014 | |
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
IT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
RS | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CY | 08.10.2014 | |
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
IT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
RS | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 08.10.2014 | |
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
RS | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | CY | 08.10.2014 | |
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RS | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | CY | 08.10.2014 | |
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RS | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | FI | 08.10.2014 | |
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RS | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | FI | 08.10.2014 | |
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 08.10.2014 | |
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 08.10.2014 | |
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 08.10.2014 | |
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/16] | NL | 08.10.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE202011051008U (KIRCHHOFF AUTOMOTIVE D GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-7 * paragraph [0029]; figure 4 *; | [X]DE102006002871 (ISE AUTOMOTIVE GROUP [DE]) [X] 1-7 * paragraph [0045]; figures 8,9 * |