EP2690810 - Radio communication device and response signal spreading method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.08.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Optis Wireless Technology, LLC P.O. Box 250649 Plano, TX 75025 / US | [2014/20] |
Former [2014/13] | For all designated states Optis Wireless Technology, LLC 313 South Jupiter Road, Suite 105 Allen TX 75002 / US | ||
Former [2014/05] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Futagi, Sadaki c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center IP Development Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
Nakao, Seigo c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center IP Development Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
Imamura, Daichi c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center IP Development Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2014/05] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2015/43] |
Former [2014/40] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2014/17] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2014/05] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13189579.9 | 12.08.2008 | [2014/05] | Priority number, date | JP20070211102 | 13.08.2007 Original published format: JP 2007211102 | [2014/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2690810 | Date: | 29.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2690810 | Date: | 21.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04J11/00, H04B1/707, H04L1/16, H04J13/00, H04L5/00, H04W72/04, H04L25/03, H04L1/12 | [2014/05] | CPC: |
H04J13/0074 (EP,BR,CN,US);
H04B1/707 (RU);
H04B1/7097 (KR,RU);
H04L5/0016 (EP,BR,CN,US);
H04L1/0026 (US);
H04B1/7103 (US);
H04B7/0626 (US);
H04J11/00 (RU);
H04J13/0062 (EP,BR,CN,US);
H04J13/102 (US);
H04J13/18 (US);
H04L1/1671 (EP,BR,CN,US);
H04L1/18 (KR);
H04L5/0055 (US);
H04L5/0057 (US);
H04W72/0446 (US);
H04W72/21 (US);
H04W72/23 (US);
H04W72/54 (US);
H04L2001/125 (EP,BR,CN,US);
H04L25/03828 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2014/05] | Title | German: | Funkkommunikationsvorrichtung und Verfahren zur Antwortsignalverteilung | [2014/05] | English: | Radio communication device and response signal spreading method | [2014/05] | French: | Dispositif de communication radio et procédé de diffusion du signal de réponse | [2014/05] | Examination procedure | 21.10.2013 | Examination requested [2014/05] | 23.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.12.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.04.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 24.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 02.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.09.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08790447.0 / EP2187549 | EP13151929.0 / EP2584726 | Divisional application(s) | EP15172323.6 / EP2940910 | EP17194369.9 / EP3285419 | EP22191291.8 | Opposition(s) | 22.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.08.2008 | AT | 21.10.2015 | BE | 21.10.2015 | BG | 21.10.2015 | CY | 21.10.2015 | CZ | 21.10.2015 | DK | 21.10.2015 | EE | 21.10.2015 | FI | 21.10.2015 | HR | 21.10.2015 | LT | 21.10.2015 | LV | 21.10.2015 | MC | 21.10.2015 | PL | 21.10.2015 | RO | 21.10.2015 | SI | 21.10.2015 | SK | 21.10.2015 | TR | 21.10.2015 | NO | 21.01.2016 | GR | 22.01.2016 | IS | 21.02.2016 | PT | 22.02.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/33] | HU | 12.08.2008 | |
AT | 21.10.2015 | ||
BE | 21.10.2015 | ||
CY | 21.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
TR | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 12.08.2008 | |
AT | 21.10.2015 | ||
BE | 21.10.2015 | ||
CY | 21.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
TR | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 12.08.2008 | |
AT | 21.10.2015 | ||
BE | 21.10.2015 | ||
CY | 21.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
BE | 21.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
BE | 21.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | HR | 21.10.2015 | |
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | LT | 21.10.2015 | |
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | LT | 21.10.2015 | |
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 21.10.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - NTT DOCOMO ET AL, "CDM-based Multiplexing Method of Multiple ACK/NACK and CQI for E-UTRA Uplink", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-062742 UL CDM-BASED MULTIPLEXING OF MULTIPLE ACK AND CQI, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20061004), vol. RAN WG1, no. Seoul, Korea; 20061004, XP050103230 [A] 1-25 * the whole document * | [A] - NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS ET AL, "ACK/NACK performance of high speed UEs", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-073002, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20070620), vol. RAN WG1, no. Orlando, USA; 20070620, XP050106666 [A] 1-25 * the whole document * | [A] - PANASONIC, "Usage of Cyclic Shifts and block-wise spreading codes for Uplink ACK/NACK", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-072799, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20070620), vol. RAN WG1, no. Orlando, USA; 20070620, XP050106483 [A] 1-25 * the whole document * | [A] - "Cyclic Shift Hopping of UL ACK Channels", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 MEETING #49BIS,, (20070625), vol. R1-073149, pages 1 - 6, XP008123369 [A] 1-25 * the whole document * |