EP2865903 - Expansion anchor with spring element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.03.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.04.2016 [2016/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HILTI Aktiengesellschaft Feldkircherstrasse 100 9494 Schaan / LI | [2015/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gstach, Peter Landstrasse 100 9494 Schaan / LI | 02 /
Winkler, Bernhard Schleipfweg 1e 6800 Feldkirch / AT | 03 /
Scholz, Patrick Bahnhofstrasse 16 9470 Buchs / CH | [2015/18] | Representative(s) | Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Corporate Intellectual Property Feldkircherstrasse 100 Postfach 333 9494 Schaan / LI | [2015/18] | Application number, filing date | 13189656.5 | 22.10.2013 | [2015/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2865903 | Date: | 29.04.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F16B13/06, // F16B43/00 | [2015/18] | CPC: |
F16B13/066 (EP,US);
F16B13/065 (EP,US);
F16B43/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Spreizanker mit Federelement | [2015/18] | English: | Expansion anchor with spring element | [2015/18] | French: | Ancrage expansible avec élément élastique | [2015/18] | Examination procedure | 22.10.2013 | Examination requested [2015/18] | 30.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/17] | 07.12.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/17] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2015 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3329058 (DEANS CUMMING JAMES) [X] 1 * column 2, lines 64-69 *; | [X]DE2164666 (PALAR NV) [X] 1 * figure 6 *; | [X]DE2656832 (HILTI AG) [X] 1 * page 24, paragraph 2; figure 5 *; | [XDI]DE3022011 (LIEBIG HEINRICH) [XD] 1-3,5,6 * page 15, paragraph letzter - page 16, paragraph 2; figure - * [I] 4; | [X]DE3110537 (BRUECKL TECHNIK [DE]) [X] 1 * page 4, paragraph 5; figure . *; | [XD]DE3331097 (HILTI AG [LI]) [XD] 1 * abstract *; | [X]DE10106844 (FISCHER ARTUR WERKE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * figure - *; | [X]DE20217548U (LIN YEN TSENG [TW]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0014]; figure 5 *; | [T] - Schnorr, "Die original SCHNORR Tellerfedern", URL: http://www.schnorr.de/fileadmin/downloads/de/schnorr_pb_de_s10-19.pdf, (20140220), XP002720679 [T] 1 | by applicant | DE3022011 | DE3331097 |