EP2866308 - Mechanical safety assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.03.2016 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.04.2016 [2016/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Multi-Holding AG Stockbrunnenrain 8 4123 Allschwil / CH | [2015/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jehmlich, Rico Hebelstrasse 27 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE | [2015/18] | Representative(s) | Frischknecht, Harry Ralph Isler & Pedrazzini AG Giesshübelstrasse 45 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2015/18] | Frischknecht, Harry Ralph Isler & Pedrazzini AG Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 13189672.2 | 22.10.2013 | [2015/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2866308 | Date: | 29.04.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/621, H01R13/631 | [2015/18] | CPC: |
H01R13/6315 (EP);
H01R13/621 (EP);
F16B41/002 (EP);
F16B5/0225 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Mechanische Sicherungsanordnung | [2015/18] | English: | Mechanical safety assembly | [2015/18] | French: | Agencement de sécurité mécanique | [2015/18] | Examination procedure | 22.10.2013 | Examination requested [2015/18] | 30.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/17] | 08.12.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/17] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2015 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE19724935 (BERGNER RICHARD GMBH CO [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * column 2, line 61 - column 3, line 25 * * figures 1, 2 *; | [Y]DE19733471 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * column 3, line 9 - line 12 * * figure 2 *; | [Y]US5651683 (SHIMAMURA YUZO [JP], et al) [Y] 13-15 * column 7, line 55 - column 8, line 21 * * figures 8-11 *; | [A]DE4131779 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-12 * column 2, line 17 - line 34 * * figure 1 *; | [A]DE19653226 (BERGNER RICHARD GMBH CO [DE]) [A] 1-12 * abstract *; | [A]GB2338355 (YAZAKI CORP [JP]) [A] 13-15 * page 9, line 7 - page 10, line 1 * * figures 5-7 * | by applicant | EP1036944 | WO2009059440 |