EP2728890 - Broadcast receiving apparatus, server and control methods thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.02.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.03.2017 [2017/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/19] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nam, Dae-hyun 709-504, Ggummaeul Hanshin Apt., Gwiin-dong Dongan-gu, Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Choi, Young-ho 101-303, Suwon I-Park City, Gwonseon-dong Gwonseon-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2014/19] | Representative(s) | Walaski, Jan Filip Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/19] | Walaski, Jan Filip Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 13189835.5 | 23.10.2013 | [2014/19] | Priority number, date | KR20120122500 | 31.10.2012 Original published format: KR 20120122500 | [2014/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2728890 | Date: | 07.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2728890 | Date: | 12.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/2343, H04N21/422, H04N21/482, H04N21/658, G06F3/16, H04N21/233, H04N21/439 | [2014/46] | CPC: |
H04N21/482 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/658 (BR);
G06F3/16 (KR);
G06F3/167 (EP,KR,US);
G10L15/00 (KR);
H04N21/234336 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/42203 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/42204 (KR);
H04N21/439 (BR);
|
Former IPC [2014/19] | H04N21/2343, H04N21/422, H04N21/482, H04N21/658, G06F3/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/26] |
Former [2014/19] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Rundfunkempfangsvorrichtung, Server und Steuerungsverfahren dafür | [2014/19] | English: | Broadcast receiving apparatus, server and control methods thereof | [2014/19] | French: | Appareil de réception de diffusion, serveur et procédés de commande associés | [2014/19] | Examination procedure | 12.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/26] | 10.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/12] | 16.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/12] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.08.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2016 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005172319 (REICHARDT M S [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * figures 1-18 * * paragraphs [0046] , [0 66] , [0 68] , [0 73] , [0 77] *; | [X]EP1308930 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-15 * figures 1-11 *; | [X]EP1863015 (FUNAI ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [X] 1-15 * figures 2,3,5 *; | [X]EP2219357 (VALUEPLUS TECHNOLOGIES L L C [US]) [X] 1-15 * figure 1 *; | [X]US2011283324 (OH BONG JIN [KR]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 1,2 *; | [X]KR20120010818 (FINEDIGITAL INC [KR]) [X] 1-15 * figure 1 *; | [X]US6415257 (JUNQUA JEAN-CLAUDE [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * figure 1 *; | [X]WO2009103226 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN], et al) [X] 1-15 * figure 4 *; | [A]WO2005029289 (AGILE TV CORP [US]) [A] 1-15 * figure 2 *; | [A]WO2011125066 (RAJARAM BALAJEE [IN]) [A] 1-15 * figure 4 * |