EP2724837 - Extruder screw with channel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.02.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.03.2018 [2018/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company 200 Innovation Way Akron, Ohio 44316 / US | [2014/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ripple, Warren Paul 1816 Swanhurst Circle NE North Canton, OH Ohio 44720 / US | 02 /
Looman, Jr., Ernest Wilford 664 Clark Drive Tallmadge, OH Ohio 44278 / US | 03 /
De Monte, Patrice route de Luxembourg 124 B-6700 Arlon / BE | 04 /
Marshall, Malcolm George 122 Apple Drive Wadsworth, OH Ohio 44281 / US | [2014/18] | Representative(s) | Kutsch, Bernd Goodyear S.A. Patent Department Avenue Gordon Smith 7750 Colmar-Berg / LU | [2014/18] | Application number, filing date | 13189999.9 | 24.10.2013 | [2014/18] | Priority number, date | US201213661392 | 26.10.2012 Original published format: US201213661392 | [2014/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2724837 | Date: | 30.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B29C47/60, B29C47/10, B29C47/92, // B29C47/08, B29C47/62, B29B7/42, B29C47/00, B29C47/38 | [2015/24] | CPC: |
B29B7/42 (EP,US);
B29C48/397 (EP,CN,US);
B29C48/271 (EP,US);
B29C48/2888 (EP,CN,US);
B29C48/505 (CN);
B29C48/56 (EP,CN,US);
B29C48/59 (CN);
B29C48/64 (CN);
B29C48/65 (EP,US);
B29C48/655 (EP,US);
B29C48/92 (EP,US);
B29C2948/9279 (EP,US);
B29C2948/92876 (EP,US);
B29C2948/92885 (EP,US);
B29C2948/92895 (EP,US);
B29C48/022 (EP,US);
B29C48/507 (EP,US);
B29C48/605 (EP,US);
B29C48/645 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/18] | B29C47/60, B29C47/10, // B29C47/08, B29C47/62, B29B7/42 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Extruderschnecke mit Kanal | [2014/18] | English: | Extruder screw with channel | [2014/18] | French: | Vis d'extrudeuse comportant un canal | [2014/18] | Examination procedure | 24.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.10.2014 | Examination requested [2014/50] | 21.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/10] | 30.10.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/10] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.05.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2017 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2896253 (JAN MOL EVERT ARY) [X] 1-3,5-7,9,10,12-15 * examples 1,3 * * figures 1,2b,2d,2f *; | [X]US4201481 (IDDON MICHAEL I [GB], et al) [X] 1,3,7,8,13,15 * figures 1,1a *; | [X]JPS57133038 (SEKISUI PLASTICS) [X] 1-3,8,11,14 * figures 1-3 *; | [X]US5304054 (MEYER PAUL [CH]) [X] 1,2,4 * figures 1-2,2a,3-4 ** column 5, lines 11-14 * | by applicant | EP0798097 |