EP2730415 - Liquid ejecting head and liquid ejecting apparatus and actuator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.04.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.05.2015 [2015/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [2014/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yazaki, Shiro c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5 Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano 392-8502 / JP | [2014/20] | Representative(s) | Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [2014/20] | Application number, filing date | 13190929.3 | 30.10.2013 | [2014/20] | Priority number, date | JP20120248755 | 12.11.2012 Original published format: JP 2012248755 | JP20130170799 | 20.08.2013 Original published format: JP 2013170799 | [2014/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2730415 | Date: | 14.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/14, B41J2/16 | [2014/20] | CPC: |
B41J2/14233 (EP,US);
B41J2/14201 (US);
B41J2/161 (EP,US);
B41J2/1623 (EP,US);
B41J2/1628 (EP,US);
B41J2/1629 (EP,US);
B41J2/1631 (EP,US);
B41J2/1632 (EP,US);
B41J2/1635 (EP,US);
B41J2/1642 (EP,US);
B41J2/1645 (EP,US);
B41J2/1646 (EP,US);
H10N30/2047 (EP);
H10N30/704 (EP);
H10N30/877 (EP);
B41J2002/14241 (EP,US);
B41J2002/14419 (EP,US);
B41J2202/03 (EP,US);
H10N30/06 (EP);
H10N30/078 (EP);
H10N30/082 (EP);
H10N30/8554 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Flüssigkeitsausstosskopf und Flüssigkeitsausstossvorrichtung | [2014/20] | English: | Liquid ejecting head and liquid ejecting apparatus and actuator | [2014/20] | French: | Tête d'éjection de liquide et appareil d'éjection de liquide et actionneur | [2014/20] | Examination procedure | 30.10.2013 | Examination requested [2014/20] | 15.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/20] | 23.12.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/20] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0919383 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]); | [Y]US2008012907 (TAKAHASHI TOMOAKI [JP]); | [Y]US2009244206 (NAKAYAMA MASAO [JP]); | [Y]US2010231657 (TAKAHASHI SHUJI [JP]); | [Y]JP2012076387 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [Y]WO2012072435 (OCE TECH BV [NL], et al) | by applicant | JP2009172878 |