15.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] |
08.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] |
24.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] |
10.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2022 [2022/28] |
03.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] |
27.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] |
06.05.2022 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2022 [2022/23] |
04.02.2022 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2022 [2022/10] |
05.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.12.2021 [2021/49] |
15.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.11.2021 [2021/46] |
08.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.11.2021 [2021/45] |
27.08.2021 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 29.09.2021 [2021/39] |
13.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.09.2021 [2021/37] |
06.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.09.2021 [2021/36] |
30.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.09.2021 [2021/35] |
23.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] |
16.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] |
09.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] |
02.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.08.2021 [2021/31] |
11.06.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.07.2021 [2021/28] |
21.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.06.2021 [2021/25] |
14.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.06.2021 [2021/24] |
07.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.06.2021 [2021/23] |
30.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.06.2021 [2021/22] |
23.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.05.2021 [2021/21] |
16.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.05.2021 [2021/20] |
18.09.2020 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 21.10.2020 [2020/43] |
11.09.2020 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
01.09.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
01.09.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
14.05.2020 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
19.02.2020 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
19.02.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.01.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
05.12.2019 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
07.08.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
19.04.2019 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
19.04.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.12.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
06.12.2018 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
21.08.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.08.2018 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
10.08.2018 |
First examination report |
|
07.08.2018 |
Change: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
03.08.2018 |
Change: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
03.08.2018 |
Deletion: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
03.08.2018 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
03.08.2018 |
Deletion: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
03.08.2018 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
03.08.2018 |
Deletion: Decision on request for further processing |
|
19.04.2018 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
19.04.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.12.2017 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
02.05.2017 |
Deletion: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
02.05.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.11.2016 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
09.09.2016 |
Change - request for examination |
published on 12.10.2016 [2016/41] |
22.03.2016 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
22.03.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.12.2015 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
01.04.2015 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
24.03.2015 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
24.03.2015 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
20.03.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
20.12.2014 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
14.11.2014 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 17.12.2014 [2014/51] |
14.11.2014 |
Change - designated states |
published on 17.12.2014 [2014/51] |
06.05.2014 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 07.05.2014 [2014/19] |