Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9624459 | Global Dossier | 18.04.2017 | B2 | US2014127372 | 08.05.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITTV20120206 | 02.11.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2727476 | Global Dossier | 21.10.2020 | B1 | EP2727476 | 07.05.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITTV20120206 | 02.11.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ITTV20120206 | 03.05.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITTV20120206 | 02.11.2012 |