EP2868752 - Nucleic acid copy number determination based on fragment estimates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.04.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.05.2016 [2016/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lexogen GmbH Campus-Vienna-Biocenter 5 Helmut Qualtinger-Gasse 6 1030 Vienna / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2015/19] | For all designated states Lexogen GmbH Campus-Vienna-Biocenter 5 Helmut Qualtinger-Gasse 6 1030 Vienna / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Türk, Andreas Taborstrasse 58 1020 Wien / AT | [2015/19] | Representative(s) | SONN Patentanwälte GmbH & Co KG Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2015/19] | Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte Riemergasse 14 A-1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 13191170.3 | 31.10.2013 | [2015/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2868752 | Date: | 06.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, G06F19/22 | [2015/19] | CPC: |
G16B30/20 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6874 (US);
C12Q1/6809 (EP,US);
G16B30/00 (EP,US);
C12Q2535/122 (EP,US);
C12Q2545/114 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Bestimmung der Nukleinsäurekopienanzahl auf Grundlage von Fragmentschätzungen | [2015/19] | English: | Nucleic acid copy number determination based on fragment estimates | [2015/19] | French: | Détermination du nombre de copies d'acide nucléique sur la base des estimations de fragment | [2015/19] | Examination procedure | 31.10.2013 | Examination requested [2015/19] | 07.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/18] | 16.12.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO2009091798 (HELICOS BIOSCIENCES CORP [US], et al) [AD] 1-15 * example 7 *; | [AD] - ROBINSON MARK D ET AL, "A scaling normalization method for differential expression analysis of RNA-seq data", GENOME BIOLOGY, BIOMED CENTRAL LTD., LONDON, GB, (20100302), vol. 11, no. 3, ISSN 1465-6906, page R25, XP021070870 [AD] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - LI JUN ET AL, "Modeling non-uniformity in short-read rates in RNA-Seq data", GENOME BIOLOGY, BIOMED CENTRAL LTD., LONDON, GB, (20100511), vol. 11, no. 5, doi:10.1186/GB-2010-11-5-R50, ISSN 1465-6906, page R50, XP021085605 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/gb-2010-11-5-r50 | [A] - BO LI ET AL, "RSEM: accurate transcript quantification from RNA-Seq data with or without a reference genome", BMC BIOINFORMATICS, BIOMED CENTRAL, LONDON, GB, (20110804), vol. 12, no. 1, doi:10.1186/1471-2105-12-323, ISSN 1471-2105, page 323, XP021104619 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1471-2105-12-323 | [AD] - ALI MORTAZAVI ET AL, "Mapping and quantifying mammalian transcriptomes by RNA-Seq", NATURE METHODS, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, GB, (20080701), vol. 5, no. 7, doi:10.1038/NMETH.1226, ISSN 1548-7091, pages 621 - 628, XP008148418 [AD] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nmeth.1226 | by applicant | WO2009085412 | WO2009091798 | WO2011070155 | US2013110410 | - QU ET AL., JOURNAL OF BIOMOLECULAR TECHNIQUES, (2011), vol. 22, page S46 | - SIMON ANDERS; WOLFGANG HUBER, "Differential expression analysis for sequence count data", GENOME BIOL, (2010), vol. 11, no. 10, page R106 | - JAMES H BULLARD; ELIZABETH PURDOM; KASPER D HANSEN; SANDRINE DUDOIT, "Evaluation of statistical methods for normalization and differential expression in mrna-seq experiments", BMC BIOINFORMATICS, (2010), vol. 11, page 94 | - LICHUN JIANG; FELIX SCHLESINGER; CARRIE A. DAVIS; YU ZHANG; RENHUA LI; MARC SALIT; THOMAS R. GINGERAS; BRIAN OLIVER, "Synthetic spike-in standards for rna-seq experiments", GENOME RESEARCH, (2011), vol. 21, no. 9, pages 1543 - 1551 | - BO LI; VICTOR RUOTTI; RON M. STEWART; JAMES A. THOMSON; COLIN N. DEWEY, "Rna-seq gene expression estimation with read mapping uncertainty", BIOINFORMATICS, (2010), vol. 26, no. 4, pages 493 - 500 | - ALI MORTAZAVI; BRIAN A WILLIAMS; KENNETH MCCUE; LORIAN SCHAEFFER; BARBARA WOLD, "Mapping and quantifying mammalian transcriptomes by rna-seq", NAT METHODS, (200807), vol. 5, no. 7, pages 621 - 628 | - NATALIA NOVORADOVSKAYA; MICHAEL WHITFIELD; LEE BASEHORE; ALEXEY NOVORADOVSKY; ROBERT PESICH; JERRY USARY; MEHMET KARACA; WINSTON W, "Universal reference rna as a standard for microarray experiments", BMC GENOMICS, (2004), vol. 5, no. 1, page 20 | - MARK D ROBINSON; ALICIA OSHLACK, "A scaling normalization method for differential expression analysis of rna-seq data", GENOME BIOL, (2010), vol. 11, no. 3, page R25 | - COLE TRAPNELL; BRIAN A WILLIAMS; GEO PERTEA; ALI MORTAZAVI; GORDON KWAN; MARIJKE J VAN BAREN; STEVEN L SALZBERG; BARBARA J WOLD; L, "Transcript assembly and quantification by RNA-Seq reveals unannotated transcripts and isoform switching during cell differentiation", NAT BIOTECHNOL, (201005), vol. 28, no. 5, pages 511 - 515 | EP20130175774 |