EP2868364 - Process for producing a purified gas stream [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.04.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.05.2016 [2016/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2015/19] | For all designated states SHELL INTERNATIONAL RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ito, Eri Grasweg 31 1031 HW Amsterdam / NL | [2015/23] | Representative(s) | Matthezing, Robert Maarten Shell International B.V. Intellectual Property Services P.O. Box 384 2501 CJ The Hague / NL | [2015/19] | Application number, filing date | 13191200.8 | 31.10.2013 | [2015/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2868364 | Date: | 06.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/14, C01B17/04, C01B17/16, C10L3/10 | [2015/19] | CPC: |
B01D53/1468 (EP);
B01D53/1456 (EP);
C01B17/0452 (EP);
C01B17/0456 (EP);
C01B17/165 (EP);
C10L3/103 (EP);
B01D2252/2021 (EP);
B01D2252/2026 (EP);
B01D2252/20426 (EP);
B01D2252/20431 (EP);
B01D2252/20468 (EP);
B01D2252/20478 (EP);
B01D2252/2056 (EP);
B01D2252/602 (EP);
B01D2255/20753 (EP);
B01D2255/20769 (EP);
B01D2255/20776 (EP);
B01D2256/245 (EP);
B01D2257/304 (EP);
B01D2257/306 (EP);
B01D2257/308 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines gereinigten Gasstroms | [2015/19] | English: | Process for producing a purified gas stream | [2015/19] | French: | Procédé de production d'un flux de gaz purifié | [2015/19] | Examination procedure | 31.10.2013 | Examination requested [2015/19] | 07.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/21] | 18.12.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/21] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2015 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDY]WO2007065765 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL], et al) [XD] 1-7,9,10 * claim -; table 1 * [Y] 8; | [YD]EP1338557 (JGC CORP [JP]) [YD] 8 * claim 1 *; | [A]US6288006 (ARRETZ EMMANUEL [FR]) [A] 1-10 * column 1, lines 12-37 * * column 4, lines 55-60 * | by applicant | EP1338557 | WO2007065765 |