EP2711427 - HCV gene [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.10.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.11.2016 [2016/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Advanced Life Science Institute, Inc. 10-23 Maruyamadai 2-chome Wako-shi Saitama 351-0112 / JP | [2014/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mori, Kenichi c/o Advanced Life Science Institute Inc. 10-23 Maruyamadai 2-chome Wako-shi Saitama, 351-0112 / JP | 02 /
Maki, Noboru c/o Advanced Life Science Institute Inc. 10-23 Maruyamadai 2-chome Wako-shi Saitama, 351-0112 / JP | 03 /
Fukai, Hiromi c/o Advanced Life Science Institute Inc. 10-23 Maruyamadai 2-chome Wako-shi Saitama, 351-0112 / JP | 04 /
Ohue, Chiharu c/o Advanced Life Science Institute Inc. 10-23 Maruyamadai 2-chome Wako-shi Saitama, 351-0112 / JP | [2014/13] | Representative(s) | Keirstead, Tanis Evelyne, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/13] | Keirstead, Tanis Evelyne, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 13191452.5 | 28.04.2008 | [2014/13] | Priority number, date | JP20070119667 | 27.04.2007 Original published format: JP 2007119667 | [2014/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2711427 | Date: | 26.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/86, C07K14/005, C12N5/10, C12N7/00, C12Q1/02, C12Q1/68, G01N33/50 | [2014/13] | CPC: |
G01N33/5008 (EP,US);
C07K14/005 (EP,US);
C12N15/86 (EP,US);
C12Q1/707 (EP,US);
G01N33/5767 (EP,US);
C12N2770/24222 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2014/13] | Title | German: | HCV-Gen | [2014/13] | English: | HCV gene | [2014/13] | French: | Gène du VHC | [2014/13] | Examination procedure | 22.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.09.2014 | Examination requested [2014/44] | 24.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/48] | 06.07.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/48] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08752225.6 / EP2151495 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2016 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2005053516 (BOARDS OF REGENTS THE UNIVERSI [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document; especially page, lines 23-33 and examples *; | [A] - "Hepatitis C virus isolate 15 NS4B gene, partial cds.", EMBL, (20070316), Database accession no. EF426326, URL: EBI, XP002719909 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - "HCV NS4B DNA sequence.", Geneseq, (20060406), Database accession no. AEF80258, URL: EBI, XP002719910 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - "SubName: Full=NS4B; Flags: Fragment;", UniProt, (20070417), Database accession no. A4GSK0, URL: EBI, XP002719911 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - "SubName: Full=NS4B; Flags: Fragment;", UniProt, (20070417), Database accession no. A4GSK4, URL: EBI, XP002577795 [A] 1-15 * abstract * | [A] - "Hepatitis C virus gene for polyprotein, complete cds, isolate: HCVT169.", EMBL, (20001206), Database accession no. AB049095, URL: EBI, XP002577796 [A] 1-15 * abstract * | [ ] - TAKAHASHI K ET AL, "Hepatitis C virus (HCV) genotype 1b sequences from fifteen patiens with hepatocellular carcinoma: The 'progression score' revisited", HEPATOLOGY RESEARCH 2001 IE LNKD- DOI:10.1016/S1386-6346(01)00122-X, (2001), vol. 22, no. 2, ISSN 1386-6346, pages 161 - 171, XP002579156 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1386-6346(01)00122-X | [A] - "Hepatitis C virus gene for polyprotein, complete cds, isolate: HCVT140.", EMBL, (20001206), Database accession no. AB049090, URL: EBI, XP002719912 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - KATO ET AL, "Efficient replication of the genotype 2a hepatitis C virus subgenomic replicon", GASTROENTEROLOGY, ELSEVIER, PHILADELPHIA, PA, (20031201), vol. 125, no. 6, doi:10.1053/J.GASTRO.2003.09.023, ISSN 0016-5085, pages 1808 - 1817, XP005313661 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1053/j.gastro.2003.09.023 | [A] - LOHMANN VOLKER ET AL, "Viral and cellular determinants of hepatitis C virus RNA replication in cell culture", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, US, (20030301), vol. 77, no. 5, doi:10.1128/JVI.77.5.3007-3019.2003, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 3007 - 3019, XP002556990 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 3011, column l, paragraph 2 - column r, paragraph 2; table 2 * * page 3016, column r, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.77.5.3007-3019.2003 | [A] - LINDSTROM H ET AL, "Mutations of the Hepatitis C virus protein NS4B on either side of the ER membrane affect the efficiency of subgenomic replicons", VIRUS RESEARCH, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 121, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.VIRUSRES.2006.05.008, ISSN 0168-1702, (20061101), pages 169 - 178, (20061101), XP024957170 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.virusres.2006.05.008 | [A] - BEARD M R ET AL, "AN INFECTIOUS MOLECULAR CLONE OF A JAPANESE GENOTYPE 1B HEPATITIS C VIRUS", HEPATOLOGY, WILEY, USA, (19990701), vol. 30, no. 1, doi:10.1002/HEP.510300137, ISSN 0270-9139, pages 316 - 324, XP002948351 [A] 1-15 * "Materials and Methods" on pages 317-318 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/hep.510300137 | by applicant | JPH08187097 | JP2002171978 | - NATURE MEDICINE, (2005), vol. 11, pages 791 - 796 | - PROCEEDING OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE OF THE UNITED STATE OF AMERICA, (2006), vol. 103, pages 2310 - 2315 | - PROC. NATL. ACAD SCI. USA, (1988), vol. 85, page 8998 | - LOHMANN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1999), vol. 285, pages 110 - 113 |