17.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] |
26.06.2020 |
Patent maintained (B2 publication) |
published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] |
20.06.2020 |
New entry: Fee for printing new specification paid |
|
09.03.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended |
|
06.03.2020 |
New entry: Legal effect of interlocutory decision |
|
06.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
07.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] |
15.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] |
14.11.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of interlocutory decision |
|
14.11.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
18.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] |
28.06.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] |
09.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.12.2018 [2018/50] |
05.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.11.2018 [2018/45] |
21.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] |
07.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.10.2018 [2018/41] |
17.08.2018 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
03.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.09.2018 [2018/36] |
13.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] |
02.03.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] |
28.02.2018 |
New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition |
|
18.10.2017 |
New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit |
|
13.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] |
06.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.11.2017 [2017/45] |
29.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.11.2017 [2017/44] |
22.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.10.2017 [2017/43] |
22.09.2017 |
Opposition filed |
published on 25.10.2017 [2017/43] |
15.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.10.2017 [2017/42] |
04.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.09.2017 [2017/36] |
14.07.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.08.2017 [2017/33] |
30.06.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.08.2017 [2017/31] |
16.06.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.07.2017 [2017/29] |
09.06.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.07.2017 [2017/28] |
17.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.03.2017 [2017/12] |
11.11.2016 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 14.12.2016 [2016/50] |
07.11.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.10.2016 |
New entry: Information about intention to grant a patent |
|
10.10.2016 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
10.10.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
10.10.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
02.09.2016 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
01.05.2016 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
18.03.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 20.04.2016 [2016/16] |
18.03.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 20.04.2016 [2016/16] |
13.11.2015 |
Change - designated states |
published on 16.12.2015 [2015/51] |
13.11.2015 |
Change - request for examination |
published on 16.12.2015 [2015/51] |
12.11.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
09.11.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.05.2015 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 13.05.2015 [2015/20] |
10.04.2015 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 13.05.2015 [2015/20] |