12.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
05.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.11.2018 [2018/45] |
06.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.08.2018 [2018/32] |
15.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] |
06.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.11.2017 [2017/45] |
01.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] |
25.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] |
10.06.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] |
13.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.06.2016 [2016/24] |
19.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.03.2016 [2016/12] |
18.12.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.01.2016 [2016/03] |
06.11.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.12.2015 [2015/50] |
16.10.2015 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 18.11.2015 [2015/47] |
14.08.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.09.2015 [2015/38] |
07.08.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.09.2015 [2015/37] |
31.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2015 [2015/36] |
24.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] |
12.06.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.07.2015 [2015/29] |
15.05.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.06.2015 [2015/25] |
08.05.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2015 [2015/24] |
01.05.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.06.2015 [2015/23] |
17.04.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] |
10.04.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.05.2015 [2015/20] |
14.11.2014 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 10.12.2014 [2014/50] |
01.11.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
01.11.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
31.10.2014 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
16.07.2014 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
04.07.2014 |
Change - classification |
published on 06.08.2014 [2014/32] |
20.06.2014 |
Change - designated states |
published on 23.07.2014 [2014/30] |
20.06.2014 |
Change - request for examination |
published on 23.07.2014 [2014/30] |
24.05.2014 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
13.05.2014 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 14.05.2014 [2014/20] |
11.04.2014 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 14.05.2014 [2014/20] |