Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9352082 | Global Dossier | 31.05.2016 | B2 | US2014134001 | 15.05.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2012248058 | 12.11.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6107065B | Global Dossier | 05.04.2017 | B2 | JP2014095353 | 22.05.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2012248058 | 12.11.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103802482 | Global Dossier | 21.05.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2012248058 | 12.11.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2730240 | Global Dossier | 10.12.2014 | B1 | EP2730240 | 14.05.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2012248058 | 12.11.2012 |