EP2732696 - Chopping apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.06.2015 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.07.2015 [2015/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wright, Richard Martin K W Farm Services Howards Close Farm Trunch North Walsham Norfolk NR28 0PX / GB | [2014/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2014/21] | Representative(s) | Wilson, Peter David George, et al Novagraaf UK Centrum Norwich Research Park Colney Lane Norwich NR4 7UG / GB | [2014/33] |
Former [2014/21] | Wilson, Peter David George Novagraaf UK 12 Meridian Way Meridian Business Park Norwich NR7 0TA / GB | Application number, filing date | 13192429.2 | 12.11.2013 | [2014/21] | Priority number, date | GB20120020581 | 15.11.2012 Original published format: GB 201220581 | [2014/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2732696 | Date: | 21.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A01G3/00 | [2014/21] | CPC: |
A01G3/002 (EP,GB);
B02C18/06 (GB);
B02C18/144 (EP);
B02C18/2258 (EP);
B02C18/2283 (GB)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Zerkleinerungsmaschine | [2014/21] | English: | Chopping apparatus | [2014/21] | French: | Broyeur | [2014/21] | Examination procedure | 12.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/21] | 22.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/28] | 27.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/28] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE19829450 (GAIL JOSEF [DE]) [X] 1-3,10,12,13 * column 3, line 37 - column 4, line 11; figure , * [I] 8,9,11; | [XI]FR2726490 (DEBOFFLES REGIS PIERRE ARTHUR [FR]) [X] 1-3,10,12,13 * page 9, line 23 - page 10, line 13; figure 5 * [I] 8,9,11; | [XI]US4485977 (SILVERTHORN CHARLES R [US], et al) [X] 1-3,10,12 * column 3, line 22 - column 4, line 53; figures 1,2 * [I] 8,9,11; | [XI]DE10235241 (GAIL FRANZ [DE]) [X] 1-3,10,12 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0040]; figure - * [I] 8,9,11; | [X]US3208677 (HESSE MYRON C) [X] 1-3,12 * column 2, line 17 - column 3, line 63; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US2003183708 (DI ANNA GUISEPPE [US]) [X] 1-3,12 * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0055]; figure 9 *; | [A]US5240188 (WHITMIRE CLIFTON E [US]) [A] 1-14 * column 6, line 45 - line 49; figure 9A *; | [A]JPH09122511 (MORI TERUO) [A] 1-14 * abstract * |