Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
07.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.06.2021 [2021/23] |
23.01.2021 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
13.01.2021 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
05.08.2020 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
31.07.2020 | Change - inventor | |
31.07.2020 | Change - German title | published on 02.09.2020 [2020/36] |
31.07.2020 | Change - English title | published on 02.09.2020 [2020/36] |
31.07.2020 | Change - French title | published on 02.09.2020 [2020/36] |
07.04.2020 | Change - representative | |
03.04.2020 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
02.12.2019 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
02.12.2019 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
19.04.2019 | Change - applicant | published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21] |
19.02.2019 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
30.11.2018 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
26.11.2018 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
16.11.2018 | First examination report | |
01.12.2017 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
30.11.2016 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
02.12.2015 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
14.11.2014 | Change - designated states | published on 17.12.2014 [2014/51] |
14.11.2014 | Change - request for examination | published on 17.12.2014 [2014/51] |
08.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant | |
13.05.2014 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 14.05.2014 [2014/20] |
11.04.2014 | Request for examination filed | published on 14.05.2014 [2014/20] |