Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2733796 | Global Dossier | 27.12.2017 | A3 | EP2733796 | 21.05.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE102013101760 | 22.02.2013 | DE102012110974 | 15.11.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102013101760 | 15.05.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102013101760 | 22.02.2013 | DE102012110974 | 15.11.2012 |