EP2733796 - Marking device with laser assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.10.2018 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.11.2018 [2018/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states mobil-mark GmbH Erhard-Grözinger-Str. 103 89134 Blaustein / DE | [2014/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baeger, Holm, Dr. Erhard-Grözinger-Strasse 103 89134 Blaustein / DE | [2014/21] | Representative(s) | Baur & Weber Patentanwälte PartG mbB Rosengasse 13 89073 Ulm / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/21] | Baur & Weber Patentanwälte Rosengasse 13 89073 Ulm / DE | Application number, filing date | 13192593.5 | 12.11.2013 | [2014/21] | Priority number, date | DE201210110974 | 15.11.2012 Original published format: DE102012110974 | DE201310101760 | 22.02.2013 Original published format: DE102013101760 | [2014/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2733796 | Date: | 21.05.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2733796 | Date: | 27.12.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/102, H01S3/113, B23K26/06, B23K26/00, B23K26/12, B23K26/082, B23K26/0622, B23K26/361, B23K26/14, // H01S3/094, H01S3/0941, H01S5/062, B41M5/24 | [2017/52] | CPC: |
B23K26/0626 (EP);
B23K26/0096 (EP);
B23K26/0622 (EP);
B23K26/082 (EP);
B23K26/127 (EP);
B23K26/1462 (EP);
B23K26/361 (EP);
H01S3/1022 (EP);
H01S3/113 (EP);
B41M5/24 (EP);
H01S3/094076 (EP);
H01S3/09415 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2014/21] | H01S3/102, H01S3/113, B23K26/06, // H01S3/094, H01S3/0941, H01S5/062 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Markierungsvorrichtung mit Laseranordnung | [2014/21] | English: | Marking device with laser assembly | [2014/21] | French: | Dispositif de marquage doté d'un agencement de laser | [2014/21] | Examination procedure | 12.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/21] | 02.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/45] | 28.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2015 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   31.05.2016 | 30.11.2017 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US6160835 (KWON YOUNG KEY [US]) [X] 1,2,5,7 * column 7, line 50 - column 9, line 51; figures 1-5 * [Y] 1-12; | [IY]JP2000343254 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [I] 1-6,8,12 * paragraphs [0033] - [0035] - [0056] - [0060]; figures 1,9-11 * [Y] 1-12; | [Y] - LAI NGOC DIEP ET AL, "Stabilization of the repetition rate of passively Q-switched diode-pumped solid-state lasers", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, A I P PUBLISHING LLC, US, (20010820), vol. 79, no. 8, doi:10.1063/1.1396320, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 1073 - 1075, XP012030079 [Y] 9-12 * page 1073, column l, paragraph 1 - page 1074, column r, paragraph 2; figures 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.1396320 | by applicant | DE10059246 |