EP2873639 - Diverting pulley assembly usable as a converter adapter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.05.2015 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.05.2015 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | 19.05.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.06.2015 [2015/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kone Corporation Kartanontie 1 00330 Helsinki / FI | [2015/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Forsström, Niko Iltamantie 4 L 13 05810 Hyvinkää / FI | 02 /
Talonen, Tapani Puistomäki 9 12400 Tervakoski / FI | [2015/21] | Representative(s) | K & H Bonapat Patentanwälte Koch · von Behren & Partner mbB Donnersbergerstraße 22A 80634 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/21] | K & H Bonapat Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13192775.8 | 13.11.2013 | [2015/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2873639 | Date: | 20.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B66B19/00, B66B11/02, B66B15/04 | [2015/21] | CPC: |
B66B19/007 (EP,US);
B66B15/02 (US);
B66B15/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Umleitungsriemenscheibenanordnung zur Verwendung als Wandleradapter | [2015/21] | English: | Diverting pulley assembly usable as a converter adapter | [2015/21] | French: | Ensemble de poulies de dérivation utilisables comme adaptateur de convertisseur | [2015/21] | Examination procedure | 13.11.2013 | Examination requested [2015/21] | 30.04.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/23] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPH0761744 (OTIS ELEVATOR CO) [X] 1-4,6 * figures 1-4 *[A] 5; | [XA]WO2010086492 (KONE CORP [FI], et al) [X] 1-3,6 * figures 1-3 * * page 6, line 11 - line 15 * [A] 5 |