EP2735675 - CLOSURE DEVICE FOR DOORS WITH AN ASYMMETRIC ESCUTCHEON [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/22] | Closure device for doors with an asymmetric escutcheon | ||
[2019/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.03.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.12.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EMKA BESCHLAGTEILE GmbH & Co. KG Langenberger Strasse 32 D-42551 Velbert / DE | [2014/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Skopnik, Jörg Tippelstraße 10 45529 Hattingen / DE | 02 /
Grunert, Martin Kuckelter Weg 14 40885 Ratingen / DE | [2014/22] | Representative(s) | Feder Walter Ebert Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten mbB Achenbachstrasse 59 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/18] | Feucker, Max Martin, et al Becker & Müller Patentanwälte Turmstraße 22 40878 Ratingen / DE | ||
Former [2014/22] | Müller, Karl-Ernst, et al Turmstraße 22 40878 Ratingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 13192892.1 | 14.11.2013 | [2014/22] | Priority number, date | DE201210111389 | 26.11.2012 Original published format: DE102012111389 | [2014/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2735675 | Date: | 28.05.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2735675 | Date: | 28.12.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2735675 | Date: | 01.05.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | E05B15/02, E05B1/00, E05B65/02 | [2014/22] | CPC: |
E05B15/02 (EP);
E05B1/0092 (EP);
E05B63/04 (EP);
E05B9/08 (EP);
E05C9/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/26] |
Former [2014/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERSCHLUSSVORRICHTUNG FÜR TÜREN MIT EINEM ASYMMETRISCHEN TÜRSCHILD | [2019/01] | English: | CLOSURE DEVICE FOR DOORS WITH AN ASYMMETRIC ESCUTCHEON | [2019/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FERMETURE POUR PORTES DOTÉ D'UNE PLAQUE DE PORTE ASYMÉTRIQUE | [2019/01] |
Former [2014/22] | Verschlussvorrichtung für Türen mit einem asymmetrischen Türschild | ||
Former [2014/22] | Closure device for doors with an asymmetric escutcheon | ||
Former [2014/22] | Dispositif de fermeture pour portes doté d'une plaque de porte asymétrique | Examination procedure | 16.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/26] | 10.12.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.03.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.12.2018 | Opposition(s) | 04.02.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.11.2013 | AL | 01.05.2019 | CY | 01.05.2019 | CZ | 01.05.2019 | DK | 01.05.2019 | EE | 01.05.2019 | FI | 01.05.2019 | HR | 01.05.2019 | LT | 01.05.2019 | LV | 01.05.2019 | MC | 01.05.2019 | MK | 01.05.2019 | MT | 01.05.2019 | RO | 01.05.2019 | RS | 01.05.2019 | SI | 01.05.2019 | SK | 01.05.2019 | SM | 01.05.2019 | TR | 01.05.2019 | BG | 01.08.2019 | NO | 01.08.2019 | GR | 02.08.2019 | IS | 01.09.2019 | PT | 01.09.2019 | AT | 14.11.2019 | IE | 14.11.2019 | LU | 14.11.2019 | BE | 30.11.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 14.11.2013 | |
AL | 01.05.2019 | ||
CY | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
MT | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SI | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
AT | 14.11.2019 | ||
IE | 14.11.2019 | ||
LU | 14.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 14.11.2013 | |
AL | 01.05.2019 | ||
CY | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SI | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
AT | 14.11.2019 | ||
IE | 14.11.2019 | ||
LU | 14.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
CY | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SI | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
AT | 14.11.2019 | ||
IE | 14.11.2019 | ||
LU | 14.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SI | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
AT | 14.11.2019 | ||
IE | 14.11.2019 | ||
LU | 14.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SI | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
IE | 14.11.2019 | ||
LU | 14.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SI | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
IE | 14.11.2019 | ||
LU | 14.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SI | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
LU | 14.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SI | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
LU | 14.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SI | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | FI | 01.05.2019 | |
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | FI | 01.05.2019 | |
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2276195 (TAKIGEN MFG CO [JP]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [AD]EP0675994 (KNUERR MECHANIK AG [DE], et al) [AD] 1-5* the whole document *; | [A]WO2007140532 (BURGUNDY TRIAL PTY LTD [AU], et al) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2012136292 (DIRAK DIETER RAMSAUER KONSTRUKTIONSELEMENTE GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-5 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0675994 |