EP2873661 - Synthesis process of trimethylene carbonate from 1,3-propanediol and urea by heterogeneous catalysis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARKEMA FRANCE 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92700 Colombes / FR | [2015/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dubois, Jean-Luc 190 Rue du Coteau 69390 Millery / FR | 02 /
Aresta, Michele Piazza Giulio Cesare 21 70124 Bari / IT | 03 /
Dibenedetto, Angela Via Confalonieri 42 70022 Altamura (Bari) / IT | 04 /
Di Bitonto, Luigi Via Emanuele Manirano 3 76015 Trinitapoli / IT | [2015/21] | Application number, filing date | 13192912.7 | 14.11.2013 | [2015/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2873661 | Date: | 20.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2873661 | Date: | 07.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C07D319/06, B01J23/00 | [2015/21] | CPC: |
C07D319/06 (EP);
B01J21/063 (EP);
B01J21/066 (EP);
B01J23/02 (EP);
B01J23/06 (EP);
B01J23/10 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/28] |
Former [2015/21] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Syntheseverfahren von Trimethylencarbonat aus 1,3-Propandiol und Harnstoff durch heterogene Katalyse | [2015/21] | English: | Synthesis process of trimethylene carbonate from 1,3-propanediol and urea by heterogeneous catalysis | [2015/21] | French: | Procédé de synthèse de carbonate de triméthylène à partir de 1,3-propanediol et d'urée par catalyse hétérogène | [2015/21] | Examination procedure | 01.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/28] | 08.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 27.08.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.08.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.07.2015 | Opposition(s) | 08.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/37] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.11.2013 | AL | 07.10.2015 | AT | 07.10.2015 | BE | 07.10.2015 | BG | 07.10.2015 | CY | 07.10.2015 | CZ | 07.10.2015 | DK | 07.10.2015 | EE | 07.10.2015 | ES | 07.10.2015 | FI | 07.10.2015 | HR | 07.10.2015 | IT | 07.10.2015 | LT | 07.10.2015 | LV | 07.10.2015 | MC | 07.10.2015 | MK | 07.10.2015 | MT | 07.10.2015 | NL | 07.10.2015 | PL | 07.10.2015 | RO | 07.10.2015 | RS | 07.10.2015 | SE | 07.10.2015 | SI | 07.10.2015 | SK | 07.10.2015 | SM | 07.10.2015 | TR | 07.10.2015 | IE | 14.11.2015 | LU | 14.11.2015 | NO | 07.01.2016 | GR | 08.01.2016 | IS | 07.02.2016 | PT | 08.02.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 14.11.2013 | |
AT | 07.10.2015 | ||
BE | 07.10.2015 | ||
BG | 07.10.2015 | ||
CY | 07.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2015 | ||
DK | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
MC | 07.10.2015 | ||
MK | 07.10.2015 | ||
MT | 07.10.2015 | ||
NL | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
RS | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SI | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
SM | 07.10.2015 | ||
TR | 07.10.2015 | ||
IE | 14.11.2015 | ||
LU | 14.11.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/32] | HU | 14.11.2013 | |
AT | 07.10.2015 | ||
BE | 07.10.2015 | ||
BG | 07.10.2015 | ||
CY | 07.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2015 | ||
DK | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
MC | 07.10.2015 | ||
MK | 07.10.2015 | ||
MT | 07.10.2015 | ||
NL | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
RS | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SI | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
SM | 07.10.2015 | ||
IE | 14.11.2015 | ||
LU | 14.11.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/02] | HU | 14.11.2013 | |
AT | 07.10.2015 | ||
BE | 07.10.2015 | ||
BG | 07.10.2015 | ||
CY | 07.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2015 | ||
DK | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
MC | 07.10.2015 | ||
MT | 07.10.2015 | ||
NL | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
RS | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SI | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
SM | 07.10.2015 | ||
IE | 14.11.2015 | ||
LU | 14.11.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 14.11.2013 | |
AT | 07.10.2015 | ||
BE | 07.10.2015 | ||
BG | 07.10.2015 | ||
CY | 07.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2015 | ||
DK | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
MC | 07.10.2015 | ||
MT | 07.10.2015 | ||
NL | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
RS | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SI | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
SM | 07.10.2015 | ||
IE | 14.11.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 07.10.2015 | |
BE | 07.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2015 | ||
DK | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
MC | 07.10.2015 | ||
NL | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
RS | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SI | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
SM | 07.10.2015 | ||
IE | 14.11.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 07.10.2015 | |
CZ | 07.10.2015 | ||
DK | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
MC | 07.10.2015 | ||
NL | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
RS | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SI | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
SM | 07.10.2015 | ||
IE | 14.11.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 07.10.2015 | |
CZ | 07.10.2015 | ||
DK | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
MC | 07.10.2015 | ||
NL | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
RS | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
SM | 07.10.2015 | ||
IE | 14.11.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 07.10.2015 | |
CZ | 07.10.2015 | ||
DK | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
MC | 07.10.2015 | ||
NL | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
RS | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
SM | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 07.10.2015 | |
CZ | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
MC | 07.10.2015 | ||
NL | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
RS | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
SM | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 07.10.2015 | |
CZ | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
MC | 07.10.2015 | ||
NL | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
RS | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 07.10.2015 | |
CZ | 07.10.2015 | ||
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
MC | 07.10.2015 | ||
NL | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RS | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 07.10.2015 | |
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
MC | 07.10.2015 | ||
NL | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RS | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 07.10.2015 | |
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
NL | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RS | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 07.10.2015 | |
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
NL | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RS | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 07.10.2015 | |
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
NL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RS | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | ES | 07.10.2015 | |
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
NL | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 07.10.2015 | |
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 07.10.2015 | |
LT | 07.10.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0638541 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1-10 * page 4, first step * * page 5, lines 16-22 *; | [A]JPH07330756 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]EP2174937 (ARKEMA FRANCE [FR]) [A] 1-10 * claims 1, 7 * * paragraph [0025] *; | [A] - BHANAGE B M ET AL, "TRANSESTERIFICATION OF UREA AND ETHYLENE GLYCOL TO ETHYLENE CARBONATE AS AN IMPORTANT STEP FOR UREA BASED DIMETHYL CARBONATE SYNTHESIS", GREEN CHEMISTRY, ROYAL SOCIETY OF CHEMISTRY, CAMBRIDGE, GB, (20030101), vol. 5, no. 4, doi:10.1039/B304182D, ISSN 1463-9262, pages 429 - 432, XP008056370 [A] 1-10 * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/b304182d | [A] - LI Q ET AL, "Synthesis of cyclic carbonates from urea and diols over metal oxides", CATALYSIS TODAY, ELSEVIER, NL, vol. 115, no. 1-4, ISSN 0920-5861, (20060630), pages 111 - 116, (20060630), XP027975915 [A] 1-10 * table 1 * | by applicant | US5212321 | EP0955298 | US6054596 | EP1156042 | US6506909 | US7005496 | JP3800247B | EP2174937 | - "Cyclo-addition of oxetane and carbon dioxide catalyzed by tetraphenylstibonium iodide", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (1985), vol. 26, no. 10, pages 1323 - 1324 | - SHUICHI MATSUMARA ET AL., "Lipase-Catalyzed Transformation of Poly(trimethylene carbonate) into Cyclic Carbonate", MACROMOL. RAPID. COMMUN., (2001), vol. 22, pages 215 - 218 | - "Catalytic carbonylation of glycerin by urea in presence of zinc mesoporous system for the synthesis of glycerol carbonate", J-W. YOO; Z. MOULOUNGUI ET AL., Studies in Surface Science and Catalysis, (2003), vol. 146, pages 757 - 760 | - S. YAN; S.O. SALLEY; K.Y.SIMON NG, APPLIED CATALYSIS A GENERAL, (2009), vol. 353, pages 203 - 212 |